|
18.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2020 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
31.03.2016 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
03.12.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
141 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
28 |