Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2274009

EP2274009 - METHODS OF TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change - representative 
08.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Corporation Service Company
2711 Centerville Road
Suite 400
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HARGREAVE, Fredrick, E.
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton, ON ON L8N 4A6 / CA
02 / VENTRESCA, Giampietro
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertforshire SG1 2NY / GB
 [2013/46]
Former [2011/03]01 / HARGREAVE, Fredrick, E.
St. Joseph's Healthcare 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton, ON ON L8N 4A6 / CA
02 / VENTRESCA, Giampietro
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertforshire SG1 2NY / GB
Representative(s)Bhogal, Jasber Kaur
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Easeman, Richard Lewis
GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2011/03]Easeman, Richard Lewis
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date09725345.427.03.2009
[2011/03]
WO2009US38509
Priority number, dateUS20080040363P28.03.2008         Original published format: US 40363 P
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009120927
Date:01.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2274009
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009
[2011/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2274009
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/24
[2012/04]
Former International [2011/03]A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
Extension statesAL14.10.2010
BA14.10.2010
RS14.10.2010
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN[2011/03]
English:METHODS OF TREATMENT[2011/03]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT[2011/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2010National basic fee paid 
14.10.2010Search fee paid 
14.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
10.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2013Fee for grant paid
01.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Opponent's representative
Mitchell, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
 02  13.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Cephalon, Inc.
41 Moores Road
Frazer, PA 19355 / US
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [2019/15]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Opponent's representative
Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
 02  13.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Cephalon, Inc.
41 Moores Road
Frazer, PA 19355 / US
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/39]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2014   
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Opponent's representative
Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
 02  13.08.2014   
Cephalon, Inc.
41 Moores Road
Frazer, PA 19355 / US
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition05.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1123/16
04.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1123/16
07.12.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/50]
07.04.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/14]
03.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2009
AT13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MK13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
TR13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU27.03.2009
AT13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
TR13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU27.03.2009
AT13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
NL13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
Documents cited:Search[XYI]  - P. FLOOD-PAGE ET AL, "A Study to Evaluate Safety and Efficacy of Mepolizumab in Patients with Moderate Persistent Asthma", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (20070101), vol. 176, no. 11, doi:10.1164/rccm.200701-085OC, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 1062 - 1071, XP055015272 [X] 1-6,8-12,15-17 * page 1063, column 1, paragraphs 1-2,4 * * page 1064, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 1066, column 1, paragraph bridging col 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 7 [I] 13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.200701-085OC
 [XYI]  - BORISH ET AL, "Update on cytokines", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, (19960301), vol. 97, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(96)80146-1, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 719 - 733, XP005476179 [X] 1,3,4,8,17 * page 726, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 7 [I] 2,5,6,9-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(96)80146-1
 [XYI]  - VAN OOSTERHOUT ANTOON J M ET AL, "Effect of anti-IL-5 and IL-5 on airway hyperreactivity and eosinophils in guinea pigs", THE AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASE, AMERICAN THORACIC SOCIETY, US, (19930101), vol. 147, no. 3, ISSN 0003-0805, pages 548 - 552, XP008146452 [X] 1,3,4,8,17 * page 548, column 2, paragraph par before "methods"; figure 2 * [Y] 7 [I] 2,5,6,9-16
 [XYI]  - CHAND N ET AL, "Anti-IL-5 monoclonal antibody inhibits allergic late phase bronchial eosinophilia in guinea pigs: a therapeutic approach", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 211, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0014-2999(92)90273-7, ISSN 0014-2999, (19920128), pages 121 - 123, (19920128), XP023760956 [X] 1-3,14,15,17 * page 122, column 2, paragraph l; figure 1 * [Y] 7 [I] 4-6,8-13,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(92)90273-7
 [Y]  - Marc Rothenberg ET AL, "Treatment of Patients with the Hypereosinophilic Syndrome with Mepolizumab", The new england journal of medicine, (20080320), pages 1215 - 1228, URL: http://www.nejm.org/doi/pdf/10.1056/NEJMoa070812, (20111221), XP055015268 [Y] 7 * abstract * * page 1227, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa070812
 [XP]  - Parameswaran Nair ET AL, "Mepolizumab for Prednisone-Dependent Asthma with Sputum Eosinophilia", Th e new england journal o f medicine, (20090303), pages 985 - 993, URL: http://www.nejm.org/doi/pdf/10.1056/NEJMoa0805435, (20111221), XP055015297 [XP] 1-17 * abstract * * page 993, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0805435
 [A]  - MICHAEL E. WECHSLER, "Combating the Eosinophil with Anti-Interleukin-5 Therapy", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20080320), vol. 358, no. 12, doi:10.1056/NEJMe0800524, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1293 - 1294, XP055015310 [A] 1-17 * page 1294, column 1, paragraph bridging col 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMe0800524
 [A]  - GREEN R H ET AL, "Asthma exacerbations and sputum eosinophil counts: a randomised controlled trial", THE LANCET, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20021130), vol. 360, no. 9347, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(02)11679-5, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1715 - 1721, XP004397495 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1720, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(02)11679-5
International search[X]US2007025994  (GREENFEDER ET AL.);
 [Y]  - GIBSON ET AL., "Eosinophilic bronchitis: clinical manifestations and implications for treatment", THORAX, (2002), vol. 57, pages 178 - 182, XP008144148
Opposition   - BORISH et al., "Update on cytokines", Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, (19960301), vol. 97, no. 3, pages 719 - 733, XP005476179

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(96)80146-1
    - VAN OOSTERHOUT et al, "Effect of anti-IL-5 and IL-5 on airway hyperreactivity and eosinophils in guinea pigs", The American Review of Respiratory Disease, (19930000), vol. 147, no. 3, pages 548 - 552, XP008146452
    - CHAND et al., "Anti-IL-5 monoclonal antibody inhibits allergic late phase bronchial eosinophilia in guinea pigs: a therapeutic approach", European Journal of Pharmacology, (19920128), vol. 211, no. 1, pages 121 - 123, XP023760956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(92)90273-7
    - FLOOD-PAGE et al., "A Study to Evaluate Safety and Efficacy of Mepolizumab in Patients with Moderate Persistent Asthma", American Journal of Respiratory and Critical Care Medicine, (20071201), vol. 176, no. 1, pages 1062 - 1071, XP055015272

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.200701-085OC
    - ROTHENBERG et al., "Treatment of Patients with the Hypereosinophilic Syndrome with Mepolizumab", The New England Journal of Medicine, (20080320), pages 1215 - 1228, XP055015268

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa070812
    - "The Prednisone-Sparing Effect of Anti- IL -5 Antibody (SB- 240563)", Clinical trial NCT00292877, (20060615), pages 1 - 42, URL: www.clinical trials.gov, XP055267616
    - NAIR PARAMESWARAN et al., "Mepolizumab for Prednisone-Dependent Asthma with Sputum Eosinophilia", The New England Journal of Medicine, (20090303), vol. 360, no. 10, pages 985 - 993, XP055015297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0805435
    - GIBSON et al., "Eosinophilic bronchitis: clinical manifestations and implications for treatment", Thorax, (20020000), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 178 - 182, XP008144148
    - LECKIE M et al., "Effects of an interleukin-5 blocking monoclonal antibody on eosinophils, airway hyper-responsìveness, and the late asthmatic response", The Lancet, The Lancet Publishing Group, GB, (20001223), vol. 356, no. 9248, pages 2144 - 2148, XP005071953

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)03496-6
    - FLOOD-PAGE et al., "Eosinophil's Role Remains Uncertain as Anti-Interleukin-5 only Partially Depletes Numbers in Asthmatic Airway", American Journal of Respiratory and Critical Care Medicine, (20030115), vol. 167, no. 2, pages 199 - 204, XP055015293

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.200208-789OC
    - KIPS J et al., "Effect of SCH55700, a Humanized Anti-Human lnterleukin-5 Antibody, in Severe Persistent Asthma", Am J Respir Crit Med Care, (20030615), vol. 167, no. 12, pages 1655 - 1659, XP055267681
    - KLION A et al., "Brief report: Safety and efficacy of the monoclonal anti-interleukin-5 antibody SCH55700 in the treatment of patients with hypereosinophilic syndrome", Blood, (20040415), vol. 103, no. 8, pages 2939 - 2941, XP055194408

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-10-3620
    - HARGREAVE F et al, "Abstracts British Society for Allergy and Clinical Immunology Annual Conference, "Prednisone-sparing effect of anti-interleukin-5 in asthma"", Clin Exp Allergy, (20040412), vol. 34, pages 1806 - 1813, XP055267737

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2004.t01-1-02086.x
    - GARRETT JK et al., "Anti-interleukin-5 (mepolizumab) therapy for hypereosinophilic syndromes", Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, (20031212), vol. 113, no. 1, pages 115 - 119, XP002393731

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2003.10.049