Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2257560

EP2257560 - SLURRY PROCESS FOR PHOSPHOROMONOCHLORIDITE SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Union Carbide Chemicals & Plastics Technology Llc (Formerly Union Carbide Chemicals & Plastics Technology Corporation)
2020 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2013/29]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Glenn, A.
2515 Woodland Avenue
South Charleston WV 25303 / US
 [2010/49]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/29]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date09725454.417.03.2009
[2010/49]
WO2009US37345
Priority number, dateUS20080040322P28.03.2008         Original published format: US 40322 P
[2010/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009120529
Date:01.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2257560
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009
[2010/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2257560
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/6574
[2013/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/49]
TitleGerman:AUFSCHLÄMMVERFAHREN ZUR PHOSPHORMONOCHLORIDITSYNTHESE[2013/02]
English:SLURRY PROCESS FOR PHOSPHOROMONOCHLORIDITE SYNTHESIS[2010/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ EN SUSPENSION ÉPAISSE POUR UNE SYNTHÈSE DE PHOSPHOROMONOCHLORIDITE[2010/49]
Former [2010/49]SCHLAMMVERARBEITUNG ZUR PHOSPHORMONOCHLORIDITSYNTHESE
Entry into regional phase28.10.2010National basic fee paid 
28.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/49]
13.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2013Fee for grant paid
03.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014   
Evonik Operations GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014   
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
26.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0477/16
28.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.03.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MK17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU17.03.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU17.03.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE17.03.2014
LU17.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU17.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/07]NO17.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2007112219  (ORTMANN DAGMARA [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 1; claim 2, formula (2); example 2 *;
 [A]  - GREENE N ET AL, "Asymmetric silylphosphite esters: Synthesis and reactivity of (rac-O,O-binaphtholato)POSiR3 (R3=Ph3, (t)BuMe2, Et3)", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 23, no. 12, doi:10.1080/00397919308011262, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 1651 - 1657, XP009117975 [A] 1-17 * preparation of compound (1) *
 [A]  - BREDIKHIN A A ET AL, "On the use of seven-membered phosphorous heterocycles based on 2,2'-dihydroxy-1,1'-binaphthalene and 1,4:3,6-dianhydro-D-mannitol in the 31P NMR analysis of the enantiomeric composition of chiral alcohols", RUSSIAN CHEMICAL BULLETIN, (199803), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF02495644, ISSN 1066-5285, pages 411 - 416, XP002531140 [A] 1-17 * preparation of compound (3) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02495644002531151
 [A]  - BUISMAN G J H ET AL, "Rhodium catalysed asymmetric hydroformylation with chiral diphosphite ligands", TETRAHEDRON : ASYMMETRY, (199307), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(00)80370-5, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1625 - 1634, XP002531141 [A] 1-17 * preparation of compound (4) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)80370-5
 [A]  - BELLER M ET AL, "Dual catalytic systems for consecutive isomerization-hydroformylation reactions", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 1301 - 1305, XP000973193 [A] 1-17 * preparation of compound (4) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(19990401)5:4<1301::AID-CHEM1301>3.0.CO;2-Y
by applicantUS2007112219
    - GREENE N. ET AL., "Asymmetric silylphosphite esters: Synthesis and reactivity of (rac-O,O-binaphtholato) POSiR3 (R3=Ph3, tBuMe2, Et3)", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 23, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1080/00397919308011262, pages 1651 - 1657, XP002531372

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919308011262
    - BREDIKHIN A. A. ET AL., "On the use of seven-membered phosphorous heterocycles based on 2,2'-dihydroxy-1,1'-binaphthalene and 1,4:3,6-dianhydro-D-mannitol in the 31P NMR analysis of the enantiomeric composition of chiral alcohols", RUSSIAN CHEMCICAL BULLETIN, (199803), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02495644002531151, pages 411 - 416, XP002531140

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02495644002531151
    - BUISMAN G. J. H. ET AL., "Rhodium catalysed asymmetric hydroformylation with chiral diphoshpite ligands", TETRAHEDRON: ASSYMMETRY, (199307), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(00)80370-5, pages 1625 - 1634, XP002531141

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)80370-5
    - BELLER M. ET AL., "Dual catalytic systems for consecutive isomoerization- hydroformylation reactions", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(19990401)5:4<1301::AID-CHEM1301>3.0.CO;2-Y, pages 1301 - 1305, XP000973193

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(19990401)5:4<1301::AID-CHEM1301>3.0.CO;2-Y