Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2269621

EP2269621 - CINNAMONUM EXTRACT FOR TREATING PHOTOAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/01]AGENTS FOR MATURING, NORMALIZING OR STABILIZING BLOOD VESSELS AND WRINKLE-PREVENTING AND IMPROVING AGENTS
[2017/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shiseido Company, Ltd.
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[2011/01]
Inventor(s)01 / OTA, Masahiro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA)
2-2-1 Hayabuchi
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Koji
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA)
2-2-1 Hayabuchi
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
03 / KUSAKARI, Ken
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA)
2-2-1 Hayabuchi
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
04 / TSUNENAGA, Makoto
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA)
2-2-1 Hayabuchi
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
05 / TAKAKURA, Nobuyuki
3-8-2 Nishimidorigaoka
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0005 / JP
 [2017/52]
Former [2011/01]01 / OTA, Masahiro
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Koji
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
03 / KUSAKARI, Ken
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
04 / TSUNENAGA, Makoto
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP
05 / TAKAKURA, Nobuyuki
3-8-2 Nishimidorigaoka
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0005 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/52]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2011/01]Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel
Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09726820.531.03.2009
[2011/01]
WO2009JP56709
Priority number, dateJP2008009336331.03.2008         Original published format: JP 2008093363
[2011/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009123211
Date:08.10.2009
Language:JA
[2009/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2269621
Date:05.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2269621
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/54, A61K8/97, A61P9/14, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08
[2012/07]
Former International [2011/01]A61K36/18, A61K8/97, A61P9/14, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2011/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:CINNAMONUM EXTRAKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER HAUTALTERUNG DURCH LICHT[2017/31]
English:CINNAMONUM EXTRACT FOR TREATING PHOTOAGING[2017/30]
French:EXTRAIT DE CINNAMONUM POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU PHOTOVIEILLISSEMENT[2017/30]
Former [2011/01]WIRKSTOFFE ZUR REIFUNG, NORMALISIERUNG ODER STABILISIERUNG VON BLUTGEFÄSSEN UND FALTENVORBEUGUNGS- UND VERBESSERUNGSWIRKSTOFFE
Former [2011/01]AGENTS FOR MATURING, NORMALIZING OR STABILIZING BLOOD VESSELS AND WRINKLE-PREVENTING AND IMPROVING AGENTS
Former [2011/01]AGENTS DE MATURATION, DE NORMALISATION OU DE STABILISATION DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS ET AGENTS DE PRÉVENTION ET D AMÉLIORATION DES RIDES
Entry into regional phase30.09.2010Translation filed 
30.09.2010National basic fee paid 
30.09.2010Search fee paid 
30.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/01]
29.08.2011Observations by third parties
20.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2017Fee for grant paid
03.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2014
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2019/09]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2019/04]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/21]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0247701  (ANGIOLAB INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-10 * sentence 5 - sentence 11; claim 2 * * page 12, line 12 *;
 [X]US2005266064  (MCCARTHY KATHRYN J [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0276] , [0284]; claim 2 *;
 [X]JP2007261996  (NARIS COSMETICS CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]  - KWON B-M ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of cinnamaldehydes as angiogenesis inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (19971007), vol. 7, no. 19, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10008-7, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2473 - 2476, XP004136467 [X] 1-10 * page 2473; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10008-7
 [X]  - "Süryaprabhägutika", TDKL, (1996), Database accession no. AK11/1517, XP002666591 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]KR100213897B  (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]);
 [X]  - CAO, H. ET AL., "Cinnamon extract and polyphenols affect the expression of tristetraprolin, insulin receptor, and glucose transporter 4 in mouse 3T3-L1 adipocytes", ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (2007), vol. 459, no. 2, pages 214 - 22, XP005921610

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.abb.2006.12.034
 [X]  - BAE, K. ET AL., "SCREENING OF ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS FROM KOREAN PLANTS", KOREAN J PHARMACOG, (2000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 320 - 324, XP008143009
ExaminationDE10017865
 FR2791255
by applicantJPH10265350
    - EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 52 - 57
    - CHO, C.H.; KAMMERER, R.A.; LEE, H.J.; YASUNAGA, K; KIM, K.T.; CHOI, H.H.; KIM, W.; KIM, S.H.; PARK, S.K.; LEE, G.M., "Designed angiopoietin-1 variant, COMP-Angl, protects against radiation-induced endothelial cell apoptosis", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (20040413), vol. 101, no. 15, pages 5553 - 8
    - THURSTON, G.; SURI, C.; SMITH, K.; MCCLAIN, J.; SATO, T.N.; YANCOPOULOS, G.D.; MCDONALD, D.M., "Leakage-resistant blood vessels in mice transgenically overexpressing angiopoietin-1", SCIENCE, (19991224), vol. 286, no. 5449, doi:doi:10.1126/science.286.5449.2511, XP002357065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.286.5449.2511
    - ARAI, F.; HIRAO, A.; OHMURA, M.; SATO, H.; MATSUOKA, S.; TAKUBO, K.; ITO, K.; KOH, G.Y.; SUDA, T., "Tie2/angiopoietin-1 signaling regulates hematopoietic stem cell quiescence in the bone marrow niche", CELL, (20040723), vol. 118, no. 2, pages 149 - 161
    - TAKAKURA, N.; HUANG, X.L.; NARUSE, T.; HAMAGUCHI, I.; DUMONT, D.J.; YANCOPOULOS, G.D.; SUDA, T., "Critical role of the TIE2 endothelial cell receptor in the development of definitive hematopoiesis", IMMUNITY, (199811), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80665-2, pages 677 - 86, XP000907291

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80665-2
    - LEE, O.H.; XU, J.; FUEYO, J.; FULLER, G.N.; ALDAPE, K.D.; ALONSO, M.M.; PIAO, Y.; LIU, T.J.; LANG, F.F.; BEKELE, B.N., "Expression of the receptor tyrosine kinase Tie2 in neoplastic glial cells is associated with integrin betal-dependent adhesion to the extracellular matrix", MOL. CANCER RES., (200612), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 915 - 26
    - NAGANUMA, M. ET AL., J. DERMATOL. SCI., (2001), vol. 25, pages 29 - 35
    - SCHWARTZ, E., J., INVEST. DERMATOL., (1988), vol. 91, pages 158 - 161
    - HARATAKE, A. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1997), vol. 108, pages 769 - 775
    - BISSETT, D.L. ET AL., PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 46, pages 367 - 378
other   - "Suryaprabhagutika", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/1517, XP002666591
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, (1996), pages 388 - 389