Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2281394

EP2281394 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTENT REPLACEMENT IN LIVE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.10.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GVBB Holdings S.A.R.L
412F, route d'Esch
2086 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
GVBB Holdings S.A.R.L
412F route d'Esch
2086 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MCCALLISTER, Benjamin
2444 Holmes Street
Jacksonville FL 32207 / US
02 / HOLTZ, Alex
11837 Tanya Terrace East
Jacksonville FL 32223 / US
 [2011/06]
Representative(s)Hill, Justin John , et al
Dentons UKMEA LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/41]Hill, Justin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London
WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2013/25]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London
W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2011/11]Hill, Justin John
IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row
London, W1S 3PF / GB
Former [2011/06]Browaeys, Jean-Philippe
Technicolor European Patent Operations 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux, Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09729744.408.04.2009
[2011/06]
WO2009US02201
Priority number, dateUS20080123673P10.04.2008         Original published format: US 123673 P
[2011/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009126275
Date:15.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2281394
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009
[2011/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[2011/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INHALTSERSETZUNG BEI LIVE-PRODUKTIONEN[2011/06]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTENT REPLACEMENT IN LIVE PRODUCTION[2011/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UN REMPLACEMENT DE CONTENU DANS UNE PRODUCTION EN DIRECT[2011/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2010National basic fee paid 
29.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
20.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
28.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.06.2014Appeal received No.  T1888/14
28.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP14175106.5  / EP2804376
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201406   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004189873  (KONIG RICHARD [CH], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0184] *;
 [X]GB2411786  (HALF MINUTE MEDIA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * page 40, line 30 - page 41, line 14 * * page 7, line 21 - line 30 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 15 *;
 [Y]EP1247220  (GEODE ELECTRONICS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 30 - line 45; figure 4 *;
 [Y]WO0209425  (AGILEVISION L L C [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 8, line 16 - line 29 *;
 [A]US5805974  (HITE KENNETH C [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 20 - line 26 * * column 7, line 3 - line 27; figure 2 *
by applicantUS2004189873
 GB2411786
 US5805974
 WO0209425
 EP1247220