Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2277162

EP2277162 - METHODS FOR DRIVING ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E Ink Corporation
1000 Technology Park Drive
Billerica, MA 01821-4165 / US
[2016/34]
Former [2011/04]For all designated states
E-Ink Corporation
733 Concord Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138-1002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OHKAMI, Takahide
36 Swallow Drive
Newton MA 02462 / US
02 / GATES, Holly, G.
189 Summer Street
Somerville MA 02143 / US
 [2011/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/04]Cole, David John , et al
46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang
Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB
Application number, filing date09730656.713.04.2009
[2011/04]
WO2009US40362
Priority number, dateUS2008004406711.04.2008         Original published format: US 44067
[2011/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009126957
Date:15.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2277162
Date:26.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009
[2011/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/20, G09G5/10, G09G3/34
[2011/43]
Former International [2011/04]G09G3/20, G09G5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG ELEKTROOPTISCHER ANZEIGEN[2011/04]
English:METHODS FOR DRIVING ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS[2011/04]
French:PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'EXCITER DES AFFICHAGES ÉLECTROOPTIQUES[2011/11]
Former [2011/04]PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D EXCITER DES AFFICHAGES ÉLECTROOPTIQUES
Entry into regional phase11.11.2010National basic fee paid 
11.11.2010Search fee paid 
11.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
09.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination06.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1735/16
03.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.08.2015Request for further processing filed
24.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.09.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.03.2014Request for further processing filed
12.03.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.03.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.04.2013Request for further processing filed
29.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.05.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
09.08.2012Request for further processing filed
09.08.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.08.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
09.08.2012Request for further processing filed
09.08.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.08.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
20.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007273637  (ZHOU GUOFU [NL] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,13-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0064] *;
 [X]WO2005054933  (E INK CORP [US]; WILCOX RUSSELL J [US]; WHITESIDES THOMAS H [US]; AMUN) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 12 - line 29 * * page 2, line 28 - page 8, line 24 * * page 16, line 1 - page 19, line 21 *;
 [X]WO2006064459  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; JOHNSON MARK T [NL]; ZHOU GUOFU [) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 32 * * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 31 *
International search[A]WO2005006294  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N. V.);
 [A]US2006232531  (AMUNDSON ET AL.);
 [A]US2005280626  (AMUNDSON ET AL.);
 [A]KR20050116160  (E INK CORPORATION);
 [A]US2007146306  (JOHNSON ET AL.)