Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2274679

EP2274679 - MULTIRATE TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR PARALLEL INPUT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thinklogical, LLC
100 Washington Street
Milford, CT 06460 / US
For all designated states
Remlin, Mark
77 Cutlers Farm Road
Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US
For all designated states
Engler, Michael
41 Weed Hill Avenue
Stamford, Connecticut 06907 / US
[2012/34]
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
Thinklogical Inc.
100 Washington Street
Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US
For all designated states
Remlin, Mark
77 Cutlers Farm Road
Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US
For all designated states
Engler, Michael
41 Weed Hill Avenue
Stamford, Connecticut 06907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REMLIN, Mark
77 Cutlers Farm Road
Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US
02 / ENGLER, Michael
41 Weed Hill Avenue
Stamford, Connecticut 06907 / US
 [2011/03]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/03]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date09730817.502.03.2009
[2011/03]
WO2009IB00393
Priority number, dateUS2008008268511.04.2008         Original published format: US 82685
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009125260
Date:15.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2274679
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009
[2011/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2274679
Date:21.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42, G06F13/40
[2011/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
TitleGerman:MEHRRATIGES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR PARALLELEINGANGSDATEN[2011/03]
English:MULTIRATE TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR PARALLEL INPUT DATA[2011/03]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION MULTIDÉBIT POUR DES DONNÉES D'ENTRÉE PARALLÈLES[2011/03]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2010National basic fee paid 
11.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
27.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.04.2013Fee for grant paid
17.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2012
Opposition(s)22.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG21.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
EE21.08.2013
HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
MC21.08.2013
MK21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
[2018/30]
Former [2016/27]BG21.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
EE21.08.2013
HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
MC21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2016/25]BG21.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
EE21.08.2013
HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2014/23]CY21.08.2013
EE21.08.2013
HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY21.08.2013
HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2014/12]HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
LV21.08.2013
SI21.08.2013
CY18.09.2013
GR22.11.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2014/10]HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
CY18.09.2013
IS21.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR21.08.2013
LT21.08.2013
Former [2014/08]LT21.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003091039  (ZIEGLER FREDERICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6574731  (COLES ALISTAIR NEIL [GB], et al) [X] 1-27 * column 5, line 64 - column 10, line 41 *;
 [X]US2003214977  (KUO JERCHEN [US]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4558445  (NOVICK LEONARD R [US]) [X] 1-27 * column 3, line 20 - line 21 *