blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2274679 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2274679



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 260
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.08.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
16.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.07.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.06.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
11.06.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
17.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
17.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
17.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
17.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.04.2013 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.12.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
18.07.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.06.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
27.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 8
22.12.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.10.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.10.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
11.10.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
20.08.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
15.10.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.10.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
24.03.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.03.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 7
24.03.2009 Description International Searching Authority 18
24.03.2009 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
24.03.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 3