blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2274679


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
03.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
27.06.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
28.03.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
19.07.2013 (Expected) grant published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
19.06.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.07.2012 Change - applicant published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
26.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2011 Change - extension states published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
25.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2011 Amendment by applicant
17.12.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2011  [2011/03]
17.12.2010 Request for examination filed published on  19.01.2011  [2011/03]
07.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2010 Amendment by applicant
04.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
16.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication