blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2274679
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2274679Global Dossier 21.08.2013B1
EP2274679 19.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB00393 02.03.2009
US8268508 11.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2274679T 25.11.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2009IB00393 02.03.2009
US8268508 11.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2430387T 20.11.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2009IB00393 02.03.2009
US8268508 11.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009125260Global Dossier 15.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
US8268508 11.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8880928Global Dossier 04.11.2014B2
US2009259878 15.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
US8268508 11.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2274679E 19.11.2013E
Priority number Date
US8268508 11.04.2008