blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2274679

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BGLapse: 21.08.2013
 CH 
CYLapse: 21.08.2013
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EELapse: 21.08.2013
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 22.11.2013
 HRLapse: 21.08.2013
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 21.12.2013
 IT 
 LI 
 LTLapse: 21.08.2013
 LU 
LVLapse: 21.08.2013
 MCLapse: 21.08.2013
 MKLapse: 21.08.2013
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SILapse: 21.08.2013
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure20.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Entry into regional phase11.10.2010National basic fee paid 
11.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted21.08.2013
Opposition procedure22.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit published on 30.07.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.01.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20101011
 
Event date:19.01.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:19.01.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:22.08.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:REMLIN, MARK
 
Event date:22.08.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:THINKLOGICAL, LLC
 
Event date:22.08.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:ENGLER, MICHAEL
 
Event date:17.07.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130620
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 628461 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20130915
 
Event date:16.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:25.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:09.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:17.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602009018176 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20131017
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG, CH
 
Event date:19.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20131113
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2430387 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20131120
 
Event date:25.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20131118
 
Event date:03.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:20.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:27.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130918
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20131221
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20131122
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:04.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 15232 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:30.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E019317 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:30.07.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20140522
 
Event date:04.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602009018176 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20140522
 
Event date:08.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:13.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20170127
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20170314
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20170227
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20170302
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20170213
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20170116
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20170309
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20170310
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20170208
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20170126
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20170127
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170320
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170214
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:26.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180327
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:29.06.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130821
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20170302
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:29.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20180331
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180903
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:15.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 628461 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:03.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK MM4A E 15232 SK
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:26.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180331
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180302
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180331
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190325
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20190326
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190326
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20190226
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180331
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:04.09.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20190904