Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2271382

EP2271382 - Two-stage ultrafiltration/diafiltration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/02]TWO-STAGE ULTRAFILTRATION/DIAFILTRATION
[2012/41]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grifols Therapeutics Inc.
4101 Research Commons
79 TW Alexander Drive
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]For all designated states
Grifols Therapeutics Inc.
4101 Research Commons
79 T.W. Alexander Drive
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Former [2011/02]For all designated states
Talecris Biotherapeutics, Inc.
4101 Research Commons, Suite 300 79 T.W. Alexander Drive
Research Triangle Park NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GONZALEZ, Martin
2 Pinnacle Point
Clayton NC 27527 / US
02 / WOOD, Woody
79 T.W. Alexander Drive
4101 Research Commons
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
03 / EARP, Fred, H.
681 Lynch Road
Selma NC 27576 / US
 [2011/41]
Former [2011/02]01 / GONZALEZ, Martin
2 Pinnacle Point
Clayton NC 27527 / US
02 / WOOD, Woody
1269 Gor-An Farm Rd
Selma NC 27576 / US
03 / EARP, Fred, H.
681 Lynch Road
Selma NC 27576 / US
Representative(s)Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P.
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P.
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
Former [2013/11]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/02]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date09731947.914.04.2009
[2011/02]
WO2009US40499
Priority number, dateUS2008011800126.11.2008         Original published format: US 118001
US2008004523315.04.2008         Original published format: US 45233
[2011/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009129226
Date:22.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2271382
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2271382
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/34, C07K1/36, A61M1/02, A61M1/00
[2012/20]
Former International [2011/02]A61M1/02, A61M1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/02]
TitleGerman:Zweistufige Ultrafiltrierung/Diafiltrierung[2012/41]
English:Two-stage ultrafiltration/diafiltration[2012/41]
French:Ultrafiltration/diafiltration a deux phases[2012/41]
Former [2011/02]ZWEISTUFIGE ULTRAFILTRIERUNG/DIAFILTRIERUNG
Former [2011/02]TWO-STAGE ULTRAFILTRATION/DIAFILTRATION
Former [2011/02]ULTRAFILTRATION/DIAFILTRATION A DEUX PHASES
Entry into regional phase20.10.2010National basic fee paid 
20.10.2010Search fee paid 
20.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/02]
19.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2013Fee for grant paid
11.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013  09.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark/Opfikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013   
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark/Opfikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.03.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition05.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1005/15
15.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
25.11.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2015/48]
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MK13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
LU14.04.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MK13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2015/13]CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
MT13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2014/09]CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2014/03]CY13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2013/52]CY13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2013/49]EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2013/48]EE13.03.2013
HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
Former [2013/41]HR13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
Former [2013/38]LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
Former [2013/37]LT13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
NO13.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT13.03.2013
NO13.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006149042  (KONSTANTINOV KONSTANTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013]; claims 1,2 *
International search[Y]US2007237762  (WINTER CHARLES M [US]);
 [Y]US4404132  (MITRA GAUTAM [US]);
 [A]US2007049733  (ZURLO EUGENE J [US], et al);
 [A]US6406631  (COLLINS GREGORY R [US], et al);
 [A]US5112812  (SAMUELSSON ERNST-GUNNAR [DK], et al)