blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2269092 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2269092



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 619
31.10.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.06.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.05.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
26.04.2017 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 7
03.02.2017 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
11.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.01.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
11.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
11.01.2017 Description Search / examination 10
11.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.01.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
30.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
30.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.11.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
12.10.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
11.10.2016 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
26.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
25.07.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.07.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 12
19.07.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 24
29.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
07.03.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.03.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 33
09.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 37
22.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 37
07.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 60
29.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
29.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
22.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
25.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.06.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.07.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
30.07.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
30.07.2012 Description Search / examination 10
30.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.12.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.11.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.11.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
26.11.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
26.11.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.11.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
20.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.09.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
27.08.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.11.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
22.10.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.10.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
24.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
24.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 8
20.05.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.05.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 3
20.05.2009 Description International Searching Authority 10
20.05.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 5
13.05.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.05.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 3
13.05.2009 Description International Searching Authority 10
13.05.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 5