blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2269092


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.11.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
19.07.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.06.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.03.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
02.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.01.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2016 Change - applicant published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
04.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2016 Change - representative
06.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.08.2013 Change - applicant published on  25.09.2013  [2013/39]
24.06.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.06.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2012 First examination report
08.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2011 Change - extension states published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
06.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
03.12.2010 Amendment by applicant
03.12.2010 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
19.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
23.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication