blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2269092 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09732632 EP17160844



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8730087Global Dossier 20.05.2014B2
US2011148689 23.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
US93740109 09.04.2009
US4529608 16.04.2008
WO2009IB51516 09.04.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101668478BGlobal Dossier 21.10.2016B1
KR20110004443 13.01.2011A
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
WO2009IB51516 09.04.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5727924BGlobal Dossier 03.06.2015B2
JP2011518326 23.06.2011A
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
WO2009IB51516 09.04.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3211451Global Dossier 30.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
EP09732632 09.04.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2269092Global Dossier 05.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
WO2009IB51516 09.04.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102007428B 25.06.2014B
CN102007428 06.04.2011A
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
WO2009IB51516 09.04.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009128002Global Dossier 22.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6029076BGlobal Dossier 24.11.2016B2
JP2015163884 10.09.2015A
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI475847B 01.03.2015B
TW200947956 16.11.2009A
Priority number Date
US4529608 16.04.2008
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3211451