Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2269092

EP2269092 - PASSIVE RADAR FOR PRESENCE AND MOTION DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/34]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FILIPPI, Alessio
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
02 / SREEDHARAN NAIR, Biju Kumar
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
03 / PASVEER, Willem Franke
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
04 / VAN BERKEL, Teun Martinus Johannes
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
 [2011/01]
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle , et al
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/01]Kroeze, Johannes Antonius
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date09732632.609.04.2009
[2011/01]
WO2009IB51516
Priority number, dateUS2008004529616.04.2008         Original published format: US 45296
[2011/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009128002
Date:22.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2269092
Date:05.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009
[2011/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/00
[2011/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/01]
TitleGerman:PASSIVRADAR ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ANWESENHEIT UND BEWEGUNG[2011/01]
English:PASSIVE RADAR FOR PRESENCE AND MOTION DETECTION[2011/01]
French:RADAR PASSIF POUR DÉTECTION DE PRÉSENCE ET DE MOUVEMENT[2011/01]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2010National basic fee paid 
16.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/01]
26.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
20.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/49]
Divisional application(s)EP17160844.1  / EP3211451
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201709   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005285787  (DELAVEAU FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0241]; figures 2,7; table 1 *;
 [A]GB2378335  (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004246177  (LLOYD PETER GREGORY [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TAN D K P ET AL, "Passive radar using Global System for Mobile communication signal: theory, implementation and measurements - Passive radar systems", IEE PROCEEDINGS: RADAR, SONAR & NAVIGATION, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20050603), vol. 152, no. 3, ISSN 1350-2395, pages 116 - 123, XP006024055 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-rsn:20055038
 [AD]  - MASAHIRO NISHI ET AL, "Indoor Human Detection Systems Using VHF-FM and UHF-TV Broadcasting Waves", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2006 IEEE 17TH INTER NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0329-5, pages 1 - 5, XP031023893 [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - TAN ET AL., "GSM based through-the-wall passive radar demonstrator for motion sensing", NEW TRENDS FOR ENVIRONMENTAL MONITORING USING PASSIVE SYSTEMS, 2008, (20081017), XP009118050 [AP] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PASSIVE.2008.4786997
 [A]  - TAN D K P ET AL, "Feasibility analysis of gsm signal for passive radar", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 IEEE RADAR CONFERENCE. HUNTSVILLE, AL, MAY 5 - 8, 2003; [IEEE RADAR CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030505), ISBN 978-0-7803-7920-6, pages 425 - 430, XP010642697 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NRC.2003.1203436