Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2279581

EP2279581 - METHOD OF SECURE BROADCASTING OF DIGITAL DATA TO AN AUTHORIZED THIRD PARTY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Attia, Jonathan Jacob
8, rue Louis Pergaud
94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR
[2013/44]
Former [2011/05]For all designated states
Etsem Limited
One London Wall
London EC2Y 5EB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ATTIA, Jonathan
8 rue Louis Pergaud
F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR
02 / PINOT, Bernard
12 rue d'Aydoilles
F-88600 Fontenay / FR
 [2011/05]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]Boesen, Johnny Peder , et al
Hofman-Bang Zacco A/S, Aboulevarden 17
8100 Arhus C / DK
Application number, filing date09733859.416.03.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009EP53087
Priority number, dateFR2008000220121.04.2008         Original published format: FR 0802201
[2011/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009130089
Date:29.10.2009
Language:FR
[2009/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2279581
Date:02.02.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009
[2011/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2011/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SICHEREN SENDEN DIGITALER DATEN AN EINE AUTORISIERTE DRITTPARTEI[2011/05]
English:METHOD OF SECURE BROADCASTING OF DIGITAL DATA TO AN AUTHORIZED THIRD PARTY[2011/05]
French:PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION SECURISEE DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES VERS UN TIERS AUTORISE[2011/05]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2010National basic fee paid 
27.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
31.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
30.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/31]
Public notificationsConstatation de la perte d'un droit conformément à la règle 112(1) CBE (OEB Form 2524 en date du 04.01.2016)
Attia, Jonathan Jacob
8, rue Louis Pergaud
94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR
[2016/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201305   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2013
31.03.201507   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201608   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0907120  (TUMBLEWEED SOFTWARE CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2007091002  (NEXTENDERS INDIA PRIVATE LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 11 * * page 17, line 9 - page 18, line 12 *;
 [A]US2007240203  (BECK MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0055] , [0078] , [0079] , [0091]; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]EP1381201  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0049] - [0060] - [0101]; figures 1-4 *