EP2282700 - STENTED HEART VALVE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2023 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. MS LC340 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. MS LC340 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
For all designated states Capps, Mark J. 2111 Cedar Lane Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPPS, Mark, J. 2111 Cedar Lane Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 02 /
HILL, Alexander, J. 1675 117th Avenue Northeast Blaine, MN 55449 / US | 03 /
MORROW, Joseph, C. 1117 Marquette Avenue Minneapolis, MN 55403 / US | 04 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, R. 99 Mercury Terrace Haverhill, MA 01923 / US | 05 /
SHAY, Janice, L. 21974 Lakeland Avenue Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 06 /
REDMOND, Jerald, L. 11365 Hastings Street Northeast Blaine, MN 55449 / US | 07 /
HOUSE, Morgan, M. 90 Halls Mill Road Newfields, NH 03856 / US | 08 /
EBERHARDT, Carol, E. 1087 West Arroyo Drive Fullerton, CA 92633 / US | 09 /
RAFIEE, Nasser 39 Abbot Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
CAPPS, Mark, J. 2111 Cedar Lane Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | ||
02 /
HILL, Alexander, J. 1675 117th Avenue Northeast Blaine, MN 55449 / US | |||
03 /
MORROW, Joseph, C. 12520 Cockspur Court Eden Prarie, MN 55347 / US | |||
04 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, R. 99 Mercury Terrace Haverhill, MA 01923 / US | |||
05 /
SHAY, Janice, L. 21974 Lakeland Avenue Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | |||
06 /
REDMOND, Jerald, L. 11365 Hastings Street Northeast Blaine, MN 55449 / US | |||
07 /
HOUSE, Morgan, M. 90 Halls Mill Road Newfields, NH 03856 / US | |||
08 /
EBERHARDT, Carol, E. 1087 West Arroyo Drive Fullerton, CA 92633 / US | |||
09 /
RAFIEE, Nasser 39 Abbot Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2016/44] |
Former [2011/07] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734094.7 | 23.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US41536 | Priority number, date | US20080125235 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: US 125235 | US20090428737 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 428737 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009132187 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282700 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282700 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2/24 (EP,BR);
A61F2/2412 (EP,BR,US);
A61F2/2457 (EP);
A61F2/2487 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2/82 (KR);
A61F2/86 (KR);
A61F2/2454 (EP);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP);
A61F2230/001 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/0045 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/0076 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61F2250/0039 (EP,BR,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERZKLAPPENVORRICHTUNGEN MIT STENT | [2011/07] | English: | STENTED HEART VALVE DEVICES | [2011/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE À STENT | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 19.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16194215.6 / EP3141219 | EP20192932.0 / EP3760165 | EP21203994.5 / EP3967274 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2017
03.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2017
03.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation 300 Boston Scientific Way Marlborough, MA 01752-1234 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | 05.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 03.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T0988/19 | 14.06.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T0988/19 | 06.06.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | GB | 23.04.2017 | IE | 23.04.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | MT | 23.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0149213 (ADVANCED BIO PROSTHETIC SURFAC [US], et al) [A] 1,16,18 * page 18, line 9 - line 20 * * figures 7-11 *; | [A]WO2005013860 (PFM PROD FUER DIE MED AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,16,18 * page 14, line 5 - line 13 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006259137 (ARTOF JASON [US], et al) [A] 1,16,18 * paragraph [0137] * * figure 14 *; | [A]WO2007071436 (SYMETIS SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,16,18 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * figure 20 *; | [A]WO2008029296 (ENDOCOR PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1,16,18 * page 17, line 19 - line 30 * * figure 7 * | Opposition | US5411552 | WO9829057 | WO0047139 | WO0149213 | WO03003949 | WO03047468 | WO2005062980 | WO2005102015 | WO2006070372 | WO2006127765 | WO2007053243 | WO2008010817 | WO2008035337 | WO2008150529 | WO2009053497 | WO2009094188 | WO2009094197 | WO2009132187 |