EP2301187 - TERMINAL FOR STRONG AUTHENTICATION OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Attia, Jonathan Jacob 8, rue Louis Pergaud 94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Etsem Limited One London Wall London EC2Y 5EB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATTIA, Jonathan 8 rue Louis Pergaud F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | 02 /
PINOT, Bernard 12 rue d' Aydoilles F-88600 Fontenay / FR | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2011/13] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Aaboulevarden 17 P.O. Box 5020 8100 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 09734547.4 | 16.03.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP53084 | Priority number, date | FR20080002202 | 21.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0802202 | [2011/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009130088 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301187 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
H04L9/321 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,GB,US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/0435 (US);
H04L63/062 (US);
H04L63/08 (GB);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (GB);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L2209/601 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04L2463/082 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (GB);
H04L63/0861 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT ZUR STARKEN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [2011/13] | English: | TERMINAL FOR STRONG AUTHENTICATION OF A USER | [2011/13] | French: | TERMINAL D'AUTHENTIFICATION FORTE D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/35] | Public notification(s) | Constatation de la perte d'un droit conformément à la règle 112(1) CBE (OEB Form 2524 en date du 04.01.2016) | Attia, Jonathan Jacob 8, rue Louis Pergaud 94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2013 | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03053123 (IRIDIAN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 17, line 4 - page 18, line 17 *; | [A]US2004264699 (MEANDZIJA BRANISLAV N [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0007] , [0022] - [0057] *; | [A]US2005076198 (SKOMRA STEWART A [US], et al) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0049] - [0061]; figures 1,2a *; | [A]US2005249236 (WALDEN MICHAEL K [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; figure 12 * |