Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2268443

EP2268443 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A ROLL COMPRISING A WELDED-ON SURFACE ; METHOD OF REPAIRING A USED ROLL WITH A WELDED-ON SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/01]ROLL FOR SUPPORTING AND CONVEYING HOT MATERIAL HAVING A WELDED-ON SURFACE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A ROLL COMPRISING A WELDED-ON SURFACE, METHOD FOR REPAIRING A USED ROLL
[2012/21]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
[2015/26]
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4031 Linz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / LECHNER, Stefan
Gartenlehnerstraße 18
A-4060 Leonding / AT
02 / LEKIC-NINIC, Marinko
Prechtlerstraße 27
A-4030 Linz / AT
03 / POEPPL, Johann
Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 9
A-4202 Kirchschlag / AT
04 / SHAN, Guoxin
Am Bindermichl 61
A-4020 Linz / AT
05 / THOENE, Heinrich
Lortzinggasse 12
A-4020 Linz / AT
06 / TRNKA, Karl
Waldingerstraße 12
A-4020 Linz / AT
07 / WIMMER, Franz
Pomedt 18
A-4752 Riedau / AT
 [2011/01]
Representative(s)Metals@Linz
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2011/01]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date09734997.102.03.2009
[2011/01]
WO2009EP52445
Priority number, dateAT2008000063822.04.2008         Original published format: AT 6382008
[2011/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009130079
Date:29.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2268443
Date:05.01.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009
[2011/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2268443
Date:27.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/04, B21B27/03, B22D11/128, B23K35/02, B23K35/30, C22C38/48
[2011/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ROLLE, MIT EINER AUFTRAGSCHWEISSUNG ; VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINER ABGENÜTZTEN ROLLE MIT EINER AUFTRAGSCHWEISSUNG[2012/21]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING A ROLL COMPRISING A WELDED-ON SURFACE ; METHOD OF REPAIRING A USED ROLL WITH A WELDED-ON SURFACE[2012/21]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ROULEAU A L'AIDE D'UN RECHARGEMENT PAR SOUDAGE ; PROCÉDÉ DE REMISE EN ÉTAT D'UN ROULEAU USÉ A L'AIDE D'UN RECHARGEMENT PAR SOUDAGE[2012/21]
Former [2011/01]ROLLE ZUM STÜTZEN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON HEISSEM GUT MIT EINER AUFTRAGSSCHWEISSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ROLLE, MIT EINER AUFTRAGSCHWEISSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINER ABGENÜTZTEN ROLLE
Former [2011/01]ROLL FOR SUPPORTING AND CONVEYING HOT MATERIAL HAVING A WELDED-ON SURFACE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A ROLL COMPRISING A WELDED-ON SURFACE, METHOD FOR REPAIRING A USED ROLL
Former [2011/01]ROULEAU POUR SUPPORTER ET TRANSPORTER UNE MATIÈRE CHAUDE PRÉSENTANT UN RECHARGEMENT PAR SOUDAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ROULEAU PRÉSENTANT UN RECHARGEMENT PAR SOUDAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE REMISE EN ÉTAT D'UN ROULEAU USÉ
Entry into regional phase12.10.2010National basic fee paid 
12.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/01]
29.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2013Fee for grant paid
07.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11184773.7  / EP2428301
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013  02.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SMS group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Klüppel, Walter, et al
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
 [2016/14]
Former [2014/01]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013   
SMS Siemag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Klüppel, Walter, et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
10.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1209/16
18.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2009
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MK27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
AT02.03.2014
[2015/38]
Former [2015/34]HU02.03.2009
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MK27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2015/32]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MK27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/32]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/07]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/52]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/48]DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/47]HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/41]HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/40]LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/38]LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/37]LT27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/36]LT27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT27.02.2013
NO27.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[XAY]GB1475300  (BRITISH STEEL CORP) [X] 1-4 * page 1, columns 11-40 * * example .; claim 1 * [A] 5,27,28,32 [Y] 10;
 [XAY]US4609577  (LONG W HERBERT [US]) [X] 1,5,27,32 * column 1, lines 7-17 * * column 4, lines 33-41; claims 1-3,6-8; table III * [A] 10 [Y] 2,4;
 [XY]GB2368849  (RES INST IND SCIENCE & TECH [KR]) [X] 27,28,32 * page 2, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 8, paragraph 2; table 1 * [Y] 2,4;
 [XA]JPS58184094  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 27,28,32 * abstract * [A] 29-31;
 [X]FR2063252  (INST T) [X] 27,28,32 * page 1, lines 1-27; claim . *;
 [A]US4484959  (BOUCHER ANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,27 * examples 1st,2nd *;
 [XY]JPH11747  (KUROKI KOGYOSHO KK) [X] 6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] * [Y] 10-26;
 [Y]JPS62207580  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 16-26 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH03275276  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 11-15,20-24 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2122925  (KUROKI KOGYOSHO KK) [A] 6,9 * page 1, lines 67-93; figure - *;
 [A]JPH106001  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 11-14,20-23 * abstract *