blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2282111

EP2282111 - ILLUMINATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAKISAKA, Shunsuke
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Rights Operations Company
IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / NOHARA, Hiroshi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Rights Operations Company
IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / INOUE, Makoto
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Rights Operations Company
IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2015/32]
Former [2011/06]01 / KAKISAKA, Shunsuke
c/o Panasonic Corporation IP Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / NOHARA, Hiroshi
c/o Panasonic Corporation IP Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / INOUE, Makoto
c/o Panasonic Corporation IP Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2015/32]
Former [2011/06]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date09735036.724.04.2009
[2011/06]
WO2009JP01898
Priority number, dateJP2008011506425.04.2008         Original published format: JP 2008115064
[2011/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009130914
Date:29.10.2009
Language:JA
[2009/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2282111
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2282111
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2013
ClassificationIPC:F21V7/10, F21S2/00, F21S8/02, F21V19/04, H01J61/30, H01J61/34, H01J5/48
[2013/43]
CPC:
F21V19/04 (EP,US); F21S8/02 (EP,US); F21V7/10 (EP,US);
H01J5/48 (EP,US); H01J61/30 (EP,US); H01J61/34 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2011/06]F21V7/10, F21S2/00, F21Y101/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2011/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2011/06]
English:ILLUMINATING DEVICE[2011/06]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2011/06]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2010Translation filed 
25.11.2010National basic fee paid 
25.11.2010Search fee paid 
25.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
22.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2015Fee for grant paid
24.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2015
Opposition(s)09.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2009
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
BG05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
IE24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU24.04.2009
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
IE24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU24.04.2009
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
IE24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU24.04.2009
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
IE24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/38]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
IE24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/10]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/08]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB24.04.2016
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
LU24.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
LU24.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/23]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
IT05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT05.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1763066  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 54] - [0056] - [ 105] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [ID]JP2007179959  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [ID] 1-4* figures 1, 2 *
International search[Y]JPH01172210U  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2008071761  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
by applicantJP2006001166
 JP2007179959
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.