EP2300691 - STEAM GENERATION SYSTEM HAVING A MAIN AND AUXILIARY STEAM GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEM Energy B.V. 800, Prinses Beatrixlaan 2595 BN 'S-Gravenhage / NL | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states NEM B.V. Kanaalpark 159 2321 JW Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROP, Peter Simon 6, Spinazieakker 2723 TR Zoetermeer / NL | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Hollaar, Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Hollaar, Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2011/13] | Hollaar, Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 09736027.5 | 20.04.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009NL00097 | Priority number, date | US20080046948 | 22.04.2008 Original published format: US 46948 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009131438 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2300691 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2300691 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2300691 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01K3/24, F01K13/02 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
F01K13/02 (EP,US);
F01K3/242 (EP,US);
Y02E10/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | DAMPFERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM HAUPT- UND ZUSATZDAMPFERZEUGER | [2011/13] | English: | STEAM GENERATION SYSTEM HAVING A MAIN AND AUXILIARY STEAM GENERATOR | [2011/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE VAPEUR ÉQUIPÉ DE GÉNÉRATEURS DE VAPEUR PRINCIPAL ET AUXILIAIRE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2009 | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | HR | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MK | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | NO | 16.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | IE | 20.04.2012 | LU | 20.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
LU | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4300192 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-17 * column 4, line 39 - column 7, line 26; figure - *; | [XYI]EP1077312 (ANSALDO VOLUND AS [DK]) [X] 1,5-17 * paragraphs [0005] - [0012]; figure - * [Y] 3,4 [I] 2; | [YDA]US6279312 (HENNECKE KLAUS [DE]) [YD] 3,4 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 3; figure - * [A] 1,2,5-17; | [X]DE10144841 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,4-17 * paragraphs [0037] - [0049]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006174622 (SKOWRONSKI MARK [US]) [A] 1,4-17* the whole document * | by applicant | DE4300192 | EP1077312 | US6279312 | DE10144841 |