Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2327236 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2327236



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 453
29.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 6
29.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
29.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 41
21.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.06.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
12.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
12.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
12.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
12.12.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
30.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
30.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
01.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
16.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.11.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
28.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
28.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.05.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.02.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
12.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
12.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
10.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.12.2013 Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax Search / examination 1
18.12.2013 Subsequently filed documents not duly signed Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
21.11.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
06.08.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
31.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.07.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.09.2012 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 2
06.10.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.05.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
23.03.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.03.2011 Invitation to appoint representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 8
25.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
14.01.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.06.2010 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 7
29.04.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.04.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.04.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
19.03.2010 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 15
11.03.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 44
19.02.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.02.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.02.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
22.10.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.10.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 5
22.10.2009 Description International Searching Authority 34
22.10.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 3