Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2327236


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.06.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.2018 Change - classification published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
15.06.2018 Change - classification published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
15.06.2018 Change - German title published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
15.06.2018 Change - French title published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
05.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.12.2015 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2013 First examination report
30.07.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.10.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
01.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
11.09.2012 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
03.03.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
03.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2011 Change - extension states published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
30.09.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
04.05.2011 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
29.04.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.06.2011  [2011/22]
29.04.2011 Request for examination filed published on  01.06.2011  [2011/22]
20.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2011 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
30.04.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
24.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
12.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
30.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication