Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2327236

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure02.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase02.03.2011National basic fee paid 
02.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201103   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2012
14.09.201204   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2012
31.08.201810   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2018
European patent granted28.11.2018
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:01.06.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20110302
 
Event date:01.06.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:01.06.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:07.12.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:04.09.2013 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20130731
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04L 12/24 20060101ALI20180613BHEP
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 4/14 20090101ALI20180613BHEP
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 4/18 20090101AFI20180613BHEP
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04L 29/08 20060101ALN20180613BHEP
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 88/18 20090101ALN20180613BHEP
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20180629