Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2327236

EP2327236 - GENERIC USSD CENTRE FOR NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K.Hippodruma Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
[2011/22]
Inventor(s)01 / STAYKOFF, Constantin
49 rue d'Amsterdam
F-75008 Paris / FR
 [2011/22]
Application number, filing date09736435.028.08.2009
[2011/22]
WO2009FR01045
Priority number, dateFR2008000481502.09.2008         Original published format: FR 0804815
[2011/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010026306
Date:11.03.2010
Language:FR
[2010/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2327236
Date:01.06.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010
[2011/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2327236
Date:28.11.2018
Language:FR
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/18, H04W4/14, H04L12/24, // H04W88/18, H04L29/08
[2018/29]
Former International [2011/22]H04W4/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/48]
Former [2011/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GENERISCHES USSD-CENTER FÜR NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN UND DIENSTE[2018/29]
English:GENERIC USSD CENTRE FOR NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES[2011/22]
French:CENTRE USSD GÉNÉRIQUE D'APPLICATIONS ET DE SERVICES RÉSEAUX[2018/29]
Former [2011/22]GENERISCHES USSD-CENTER FÜR NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN UND DIENSTE
Former [2011/22]CENTRE USSD GENERIQUE D'APPLICATIONS ET DE SERVICES RESEAUX
Entry into regional phase02.03.2011National basic fee paid 
02.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/22]
31.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2018Fee for grant paid
20.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2013
Opposition(s)29.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201103   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2012
14.09.201204   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2012
31.08.201810   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AT28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/30]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]  - ANONYMOUS, "Redefining over-the-phone customer service", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20080331), URL: http://www.voiceobjects.com/files/en/voiceobjects_7_product_brief_en.pdf, (20090511), XP002528244 [X] 1-16,18,20-35 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "USSD Services for Interactive Mobile Users - Building User-Friendly Mobile Telephony Applications Using Dialogic Distributed Signaling Interface Components", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20080831), URL: http://www.dialogic.com/products/docs/appnotes/11038_USSD_an.pdf, (20080511), XP002528245 [X] 1-16,18,20-35 * abstract * * pages 2-8 * * pages 11-12 *
 [A]  - THE MORIANA GROUP, Service Delivery Platforms And Telecom Web Services - An Industry Wide Perspective, MAC TAYLOR, (20040630), XP002528246 [A] 1-16,18,20-35 * pages 100-103 * * pages 164-174 *