Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2478630

EP2478630 - INVERTER WITH COMMUTATION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESAB AB
Box 8004
402 77 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]For all designated states
Esab AB
Box 8004
402 77 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / KARLSSON, Rolf
Arvid Rödings väg 21
S-695 32 Laxå / SE
02 / ANDERSSON, Per
Bjurbacksvägen 40
S-543 95 Fagersanna / SE
03 / VESSMAN, Dan
Häggeboda
S-695 97 Tived / SE
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)Israelsson, Stefan , et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB
P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09736867.414.09.2009
WO2009EP61872
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011029482
Date:17.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2478630
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011
[2012/30]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP17.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:H02M5/458
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/30]
TitleGerman:UMRICHTER MIT KOMMUTIERUNGSKREIS[2012/30]
English:INVERTER WITH COMMUTATION CIRCUIT[2012/30]
French:INVERSEUR À CIRCUIT DE COMMUTATION[2012/30]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2012National basic fee paid 
20.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/30]
07.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/22]
12.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/22]
Appeal following examination01.09.2014Appeal received No.  J0023/14
21.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal
15.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
16.04.201203   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012
30.09.201204   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US6330170  (WANG KUNRONG [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 14 - line 36 * [A] 13-16 [I] 9-12;
 [IA]US6333611  (SHIBUYA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * column 3 - column 4; figure 2 * [A] 13-16;
 [IA]EP1484832  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [A] 13-16;
 [AD]EP1422011  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034]; figure 2 *