Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2274675

EP2274675 - INTERFACING MULTIPLE LOGICAL PARTITIONS TO A SELF-VIRTUALIZING INPUT/OUTPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[2012/01]
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARMSTRONG, William
IBM Corporation
MD GHD
3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
02 / GRAHAM, Charles
IBM Corporation
MD 030-2-c340
3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
03 / KAO, Sandy
IBM Corporation
MD 4354
11400 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3493 / US
04 / LUCKE, Kyle
IBM Corporation
MD GHD
3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
05 / NAYAR, Naresh
IBM Corporation
MD GHD
3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
06 / OSTROWSKI, Michal
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
07 / RECIO, Renato
IBM Corporation
MD 904 3G012
11400 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3493 / US
08 / SWANBERG, Randal
IBM Corporation
MD 905-4G011
11501 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3400 / US
 [2012/01]
Former [2011/03]01 / ARMSTRONG, William
IBM Corporation MD GHD 3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
02 / GRAHAM, Charles
IBM Corporation MD 030-2-c340 3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
03 / KAO, Sandy
IBM Corporation MD 4354 11400 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3493 / US
04 / LUCKE, Kyle
IBM Corporation MD GHD 3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
05 / NAYAR, Naresh
IBM Corporation MD GHD 3605 Hwy 52 N
Rochester, Minnesota 55901-1407 / US
06 / OSTROWSKI, Michal
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
07 / RECIO, Renato
IBM Corporation MD 904 3G012 11400 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3493 / US
08 / SWANBERG, Randal
IBM Corporation MD 905-4G011 11501 Burnet Road
Austin, Texas 78758-3400 / US
Representative(s)Shaw, Anita
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2012/01]
Former [2011/03]Shaw, Anita
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date09738059.623.04.2009
[2011/03]
WO2009EP54890
Priority number, dateUS2008011102028.04.2008         Original published format: US 111020
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009133015
Date:05.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2274675
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009
[2011/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2274675
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455, G06F12/14
[2011/38]
Former International [2011/03]G06F9/455
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
TitleGerman:SCHNITTSTELLE ZWISCHEN MEHREREN LOGISCHEN PARTITIONEN UND EINER SELBSVIRTUALISIERENDEN EINGABE-/AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG[2011/03]
English:INTERFACING MULTIPLE LOGICAL PARTITIONS TO A SELF-VIRTUALIZING INPUT/OUTPUT DEVICE[2011/03]
French:INTERFAÇAGE DE PARTITIONS LOGIQUES MULTIPLES AVEC UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE-SORTIE D'AUTOVIRTUALISATION[2011/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2010National basic fee paid 
14.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
20.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2011Fee for grant paid
17.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2011
Opposition(s)05.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.04.2009
AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
ES15.04.2012
LU23.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
ES15.04.2012
LU23.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2014/21]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
TR04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
ES15.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2013/35]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
MT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
ES15.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2013/22]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
ES15.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2013/12]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
MK04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2013/07]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/50]BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/49]BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
CZ04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/48]BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/41]BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/39]BE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
LV04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/37]BE04.01.2012
FI04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
PL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/36]BE04.01.2012
HR04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/35]BE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
NO04.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/34]BE04.01.2012
LT04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
NO04.04.2012
IS04.05.2012
Former [2012/25]SI04.01.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006064523  (MORIKI TOSHIOMI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0116]; figure 11 *;
 [A]US2008091855  (MOERTL DANIEL F [US] ET AL MOERTI DANIEL F [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0095] *;
 [A]EP1691287  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0075] *;
 [A]EP1548589  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0045]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US2006250945  (FERNANDES LILIAN S [IN] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0060]; figures 5,6 *;
 [DA]  - PCI-SIG, "Single Root I/O Virtualization and Sharing Specification. Revision 1.0", (20070911), pages 1 - 84, URL: http://markmail.org/download.xqy?id=rgzno5ootvdywfec&number=1, (20090807), XP002540516 [DA] 1-16 * page 11 - page 24 *