Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2279474

EP2279474 - CONFLICT RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2011/05]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAILOR, Jonathan, Beckett
C/o Microsoft Corporation Lca, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / BERNSTEIN, Ethan, Joseph
c/0 Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / KROUT, Kelly, Michael
c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / MIZULO, Matthew, Eric
c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington98052-6399 / US
05 / GORDNER, Jonathan Ian
c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2011/07]
Former [2011/05]01 / BAILOR, Jonathan, Beckett
C/o Microsoft Corporation Lca, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / BERNSTEIN, Ethan, Joseph
c/0 Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / KROUT, Kelly, Michael
c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / MIZULO, Matthew, Eric
c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA, International Patents Department One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington98052-6399 / US
05 / GORDNER, Jonathan Ian
.
. / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09739350.823.03.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009US37920
Priority number, dateUS2008011117428.04.2008         Original published format: US 111174
[2011/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009134548
Date:05.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2279474
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009
[2011/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.01.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06F17/24, G06F17/21, G06F17/30
[2011/49]
Former International [2011/05]G06F17/24, G06F17/21, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/05]
TitleGerman:KONFLIKTAUFLÖSUNG[2011/05]
English:CONFLICT RESOLUTION[2011/05]
French:RÉSOLUTION DE CONFLITS[2011/05]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2010National basic fee paid 
24.11.2010Search fee paid 
24.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
08.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.02.2014Appeal received No.  T1030/14
14.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1681652  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 36] , [0 41] , [0 49] - [0062]; figure 4 * [I] 10-15;
 [XI]US2007283321  (HEGDE RAJESH [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 53] , [0054] , [0066] - [0072]; figures 8-10 * [I] 10-15;
 [XP]US2008235579  (CHAMPION DAVID FREDERICK [US], et al) [XP] 1-9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0020] - [0030] *;
 [XI]US2004177343  (MCVOY LAWRENCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 14] , [0 40] - [0056] * [I] 10-15;
 [I]DE19844071  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, line 32 - line 55 * * column 5, line 43 - column 8, line 18 * * column 12, lines 10-35 *;
 [I]  - David Bellagio ET AL, "Software Configuration Management Strategies and IBM Rational ClearCase : A Practical Introduction, Second Edition", Software Configuration Management Strategies and IBM Rational ClearCase : A Practical Introduction, Second Edition, IBM Press, (20050523), pages 173 - 178, ISBN 978-0-32-120019-8, XP055009093 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2006200755  (MELMON KEITH [US], et al);
 [A]US2004122870  (PARK JOONG-KI [KR], et al);
 [A]US2007283321  (HEGDE RAJESH [US], et al)
by applicantEP1681652
 US2007283321
 US2008235579
 US2004177343
 DE19844071
    - "Software Configuration Management Strategies and IBM Rational ClearCase: A Practical Introduction, Second Edition", DAVID BELLAGIO ET AL., Software Configuration Management Strategies and IBM Rational ClearCase : A Practical Introduction, IBM PRESS, PAGES, (20050523), pages 173 - 178