blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2279250

EP2279250 - FUSION MOLECULES OF RATIONALLY-DESIGNED DNA-BINDING PROTEINS AND EFFECTOR DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2012  [2012/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precision Biosciences, Inc.
302 East Pettigrew Street
Dibrell Building, Suite A-100
Durham, NC 27701 / US
[2011/36]
Former [2011/05]For all designated states
Precision Biosciences, Inc.
104 T.W. Alexander Drive Bldg. 7
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NICHOLSON, Michael, G.
1200 Willow Drive
Chapel Hill NC 27517 / US
02 / JANTZ, Derek
215 Hillview Drive
Durham NC 27703 / US
03 / SMITH, James, Jefferson
1808 Carnation Drive
Durham NC 27703 / US
 [2011/05]
Representative(s)Grund, Martin, et al
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB
Steinsdorfstraße 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/12]Grund, Martin, et al
Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Former [2011/05]Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date09739516.427.04.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009US41796
Priority number, dateUS20080048499P28.04.2008         Original published format: US 48499 P
[2011/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2009134714
Date:05.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2279250
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.01.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2011
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/22, C12Q1/68
[2011/05]
CPC:
C12N9/22 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61K48/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/05]
TitleGerman:FUSIONSMOLEKÜLE VON DNA-BINDENDEN PROTEINEN MIT RATIONALEM DESIGN UND EFFEKTOR-DOMÄNEN[2011/05]
English:FUSION MOLECULES OF RATIONALLY-DESIGNED DNA-BINDING PROTEINS AND EFFECTOR DOMAINS[2011/05]
French:MOLÉCULES DE FUSION DE PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À L'ADN ET DE DOMAINES EFFECTEURS CONÇUS DE FAÇON RATIONNELLE[2011/05]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2010National basic fee paid 
17.11.2010Search fee paid 
17.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
10.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/40]
15.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - CHEVALIER BRETT ET AL, "Metal-dependent DNA cleavage mechanism of the I-CreI LAGLIDADG homing endonuclease", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20041109), vol. 43, no. 44, doi:10.1021/BI048970C, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 14015 - 14026, XP002412602 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 14019; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi048970c
International search[X]US2007117128  (SMITH JAMES J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006078552  (ARNOULD SYLVAIN [FR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.