blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2285213

EP2285213 - MICROEMULSION GERMICIDAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.01.2014  [2014/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon, Inc
U.S. Route 22
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
[2011/08]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Qiang
20041 Osterman Road, 14E
Lake Forest CA 92630 / US
02 / FRENCH, Chris
21361 Kirkwall Lane
Lake Forest CA 92630 / US
03 / ROBERTS, Charles
2221 Senasac Avenue
Long Beach CA 90815 / US
 [2011/13]
Former [2011/08]01 / LI, Qiang
20041 Osterman Road, 14E
Lake Forest CA 92630 / US
02 / FRENCH, Chris
26931 La Alameda, 2115
Mission Viejo CA 92691 / US
03 / ROBERTS, Charles
2221 Senasac Avenue
Long Beach CA 90815 / US
Representative(s)James, Anthony Christopher W.P.
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/08]James, Anthony Christopher W.P.
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date09739781.430.04.2009
[2011/08]
WO2009US42269
Priority number, dateUS20080049994P02.05.2008         Original published format: US 49994 P
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2009134979
Date:05.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2285213
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.2010
ClassificationIPC:A01N31/02, A01N35/04, A01N43/30, A01N59/00
[2013/03]
CPC:
A01N31/02 (EP,US); A01N35/04 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/02, A01N35/04, A01N43/30, A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A01N35/04, A01N2300/00 (US,EP)
Former IPC [2011/08]A01N25/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:KEIMTÖTENDE MIKROEMULSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2011/08]
English:MICROEMULSION GERMICIDAL COMPOSITION[2011/08]
French:COMPOSITION GERMICIDE EN MICRO-ÉMULSION[2011/08]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2010National basic fee paid 
28.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/08]
28.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/02]
19.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0292301  (SURGIKOS INC [US]) [A] 1-9* page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 10 *;
 [A]EP1547621  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0120] * * examples 9, 11 *;
 [A]EP1559435  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] *;
 [A]EP1661587  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0094] * * examples 9, 11 *;
 [A]CN1836508  (HUANG YAQIN [CN]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.