EP2493490 - PHARMACEUTICAL OR VETERINARY MEDICAL PREPARATION OBTAINED FROM COCONUT (COCOS NUCIFERA) AND ONION (ALLIUM CEPA) FOR CONTROLLING FLATWORMS (PLATHELMINTHES) AND/OR THREADWORMS (NEMATODES) IN ANIMALS OR HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mehlhorn, Heinz St. Georgstr. 21 41468 Neuss / DE | For all designated states King Saud University Box 2454 Riyadh 11451 / SA | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Juergen Norfer Weg 27 40221 Duesseldorf / DE | 02 /
ABDEL GHAFFAR, Fathy Dept. Zoology Faculty of Science Cairo University Cairo Cairo / EG | 03 /
AL RASHEID, Khaled Zoology Dept. College of Science King Saud University Riyadh / SA | 04 /
QURAISHI, Saleh Zoology Dept. College of Science King Saud University Riyadh / SA | 05 /
AL-FARHAN, Ahmad Botany and Microbiology Dept. College of Science King Saud University Riyadh / SA | 06 /
SCHMAHL, Guenther Merheimer Str. 478 50735 Koeln / DE | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09741264.7 | 08.10.2009 | WO2009EP63072 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011042054 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493490 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493490 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/889, A61K36/8962, A61P33/10 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
A61K36/889 (EP);
A61K36/8962 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/889, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/8962, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ODER VETERINÄRMEDIZINISCHE ZUBEREITUNG AUS DER KOKOSNUSS (COCOS NUCIFERA) UND ZWIEBEL (ALLIUM CEPA) ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PLATTWÜRMERN (PLATHELMINTHES) UND/ODER FADENWÜRMERN (NEMATODEN) BEI TIEREN ODER MENSCHEN | [2013/43] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL OR VETERINARY MEDICAL PREPARATION OBTAINED FROM COCONUT (COCOS NUCIFERA) AND ONION (ALLIUM CEPA) FOR CONTROLLING FLATWORMS (PLATHELMINTHES) AND/OR THREADWORMS (NEMATODES) IN ANIMALS OR HUMANS | [2012/36] | French: | PRÉPARATION MÉDICALE PHARMACEUTIQUE OU VÉTÉRINAIRE OBTENUE À PARTIR DE LA NOIX DE COCO (COCOS NUCIFERA) ET DE L'OIGNON (ALLIUM CEPA) POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES VERRES PLATS (PLATHELMINTHES) ET/OU LES VERS RONDS (NÉMATODES) CHEZ LES ANIMAUX OU LES ÊTRES HUMAINS | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/36] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ODER VETERINÄRMEDIZINISCHE ZUBEREITUNG AUS DER KOKOSNUSS (COCOS NUCIFERA) UND ZWIEBEL (ALLIUM CEPA) ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PLATTWÜRMERN (PLATHELMINTHES) UND/ODER BANDWÜRMERN (NEMATODEN) BEI TIEREN ODER MENSCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 01.11.2012 | Observations by third parties | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Request for further processing for: | 15.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2009 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | IE | 08.10.2014 | LU | 08.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]IN188248 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 03, Database accession no. 2010-A08585, XP002585050 & IN188248 A1 20020831 (MARKOSE K N) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - HUSSAIN A ET AL, "An account of the botanical anthelmintics used in traditional veterinary practices in Sahiwal district of Punjab, Pakistan", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, vol. 119, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JEP.2008.06.034, ISSN 0378-8741, (20080902), pages 185 - 190, (20080709), XP023904703 [A] 1-16 * tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2008.06.034 | [AD] - OLIVEIRA L M B ET AL, "Anthelmintic activity of Cocos nucifera L. against sheep gastrointestinal nematodes", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 159, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VETPAR.2008.10.018, ISSN 0304-4017, (20090122), pages 55 - 59, (20081015), XP025805188 [AD] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018 | [AD] - ABU EL EZZ NADIA M T, Effect of Nigella sativa and Allium cepa oils on Trichinella spiralis in experimentally infected rats., JOURNAL OF THE EGYPTIAN SOCIETY OF PARASITOLOGY, (200508), ISSN 0253-5890, XP009134260 [AD] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | - "Database WPI, Week 20103" | - "Aavialikkum Amuthamurai Churukkam, Palani Thandayuthapani Devasthanam pubications", K. MUDALIAR, Directorate of Indian Systems of Medicine, page 53 | - ABU EL EZZ NM, "Effects of Nigella sativa and Allium cepa oils on Trichinella spiralis in experimentally infected rats", I EGYPT SOC PARASITOL, (2005), vol. 35, pages 511 - 523 | - AMORIM A.; BORBA HR, "Acav Antihelmintica de plantas X Testes in- vivo com extratos brutos de Cocos nucifera", REV BRAS FARM, (1994), vol. 75, pages 91 - 92 | - AMORIM A; BORBA HR, "Acav Antihelmintica XI. Influcencia de extractos brutos nucifera", REV BRAS FARM, (1995), vol. 76, pages 98 - 99 | - ATHANASIADOU S.; ELTHIORI J; KYRIAZAKIS I, "Medicinal plants for helminth parasite control: facts and fictions", ANIMAL, (2007), vol. 19, pages 1392 - 1400 | - AYAZ E, TÜREL; GÜL A.; SILMAZ O, "Evaluation of the anthelminthic activity of garlic (Alllum satlvum) in mice naturally infected with Aspiculuris tetraptera", RECENT PAT ANTIINFECT DRUG DISC, (2008), vol. 3, pages 149 - 152 | - BASTIDAS G, "Effects of ingested garlic on Necator americanus and Necator caninum", AM J TROP MET HYG, (1969), vol. 18, pages 920 - 923 | - COSHA CTC; OLIVEIRA LMB; CAMURGA VASCONALOS ALF ET AL., "Atividade antihelminthica de Cocos nucifera", VET. PARASITOL, (2009), vol. 157, pages 211 - 213 | - FAJIMI AK; TAIWO AA, "Herbal remedies in animal parasitic diseases in Nigeria: A review. African J", BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 4, pages 303 - 307, XP009079382 | - GIOVE N, "Traditional medicine in the treatment of enteroparasitosis", REV. GASTROENTEROL. PERU, (1996), vol. 16, pages 197 - 202 | - IQBAL Z; KHAHID-NADEEM Q; KHAN MN; AKTHAR MSS; WARAICH FN, "In vitro anthelmintic activity of Allium sativum, Zingiber officinale and Ficus religios", I. AGRICULT, BIOL., (2001), vol. 3, pages 454 - 457 | - OLIVEIRA LMB ET AL., "Anthelmintic activity of Cocos nucifera against sheep gastrointestinal nematodes", VET. PARASITOL., (2009), vol. 159, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018, pages 55 - 59, XP025805188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018 | other | - "Karuppa Vayukku Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/17, XP003032007 | - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, Athhmarakshaamirtham, (1879), page 53 | - "Coconut", TKDL, Database accession no. MA1/65I, XP003032008 | - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ LBN AL-QUFF MASEEHI, Kitaab-al-'Umdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), page 226 | - "Dawa Barae Dood", TKDL, Database accession no. AA11/109, XP003032009 | - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKAIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1962), vol. XI, page 18 | - "Narikelapuspajalagunaah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4964, XP003032010 | - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara, (1997), vol. IV, page 427 | - "Dawa Basl-ul-faar Bara-e-Kirm-e-Shikam", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/114K, XP003032011 | - MAHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, page 121 | - "Hingula Rasayan Vidhi(2)", TKDL, Database accession no. RS22/700B, XP003032012 | - Rasatanrasarah Evam Siddhaprayogasamgrahah, (1990), page 475 | - "Hab Deegar Qawitar", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/4069, XP003032013 | - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 613 | - "Vizhi Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. PD04/248, XP003032014 | - AGASTHIYAR, Agathiar Vaithiam, page 128 |