Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2493490

EP2493490 - PHARMACEUTICAL OR VETERINARY MEDICAL PREPARATION OBTAINED FROM COCONUT (COCOS NUCIFERA) AND ONION (ALLIUM CEPA) FOR CONTROLLING FLATWORMS (PLATHELMINTHES) AND/OR THREADWORMS (NEMATODES) IN ANIMALS OR HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mehlhorn, Heinz
St. Georgstr. 21
41468 Neuss / DE
For all designated states
King Saud University
Box 2454
Riyadh 11451 / SA
[2012/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Juergen
Norfer Weg 27
40221 Duesseldorf / DE
02 / ABDEL GHAFFAR, Fathy
Dept. Zoology
Faculty of Science Cairo
University Cairo
Cairo / EG
03 / AL RASHEID, Khaled
Zoology Dept.
College of Science
King Saud University
Riyadh / SA
04 / QURAISHI, Saleh
Zoology Dept.
College of Science
King Saud University
Riyadh / SA
05 / AL-FARHAN, Ahmad
Botany and Microbiology Dept.
College of Science
King Saud University
Riyadh / SA
06 / SCHMAHL, Guenther
Merheimer Str. 478
50735 Koeln / DE
 [2012/36]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/12]
Former [2012/36]Gille Hrabal
Patentanwälte
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date09741264.708.10.2009
WO2009EP63072
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011042054
Date:14.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2493490
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011
[2012/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2493490
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/889, A61K36/8962, A61P33/10
[2012/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ODER VETERINÄRMEDIZINISCHE ZUBEREITUNG AUS DER KOKOSNUSS (COCOS NUCIFERA) UND ZWIEBEL (ALLIUM CEPA) ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PLATTWÜRMERN (PLATHELMINTHES) UND/ODER FADENWÜRMERN (NEMATODEN) BEI TIEREN ODER MENSCHEN[2013/43]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL OR VETERINARY MEDICAL PREPARATION OBTAINED FROM COCONUT (COCOS NUCIFERA) AND ONION (ALLIUM CEPA) FOR CONTROLLING FLATWORMS (PLATHELMINTHES) AND/OR THREADWORMS (NEMATODES) IN ANIMALS OR HUMANS[2012/36]
French:PRÉPARATION MÉDICALE PHARMACEUTIQUE OU VÉTÉRINAIRE OBTENUE À PARTIR DE LA NOIX DE COCO (COCOS NUCIFERA) ET DE L'OIGNON (ALLIUM CEPA) POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES VERRES PLATS (PLATHELMINTHES) ET/OU LES VERS RONDS (NÉMATODES) CHEZ LES ANIMAUX OU LES ÊTRES HUMAINS[2012/36]
Former [2012/36]PHARMAZEUTISCHE ODER VETERINÄRMEDIZINISCHE ZUBEREITUNG AUS DER KOKOSNUSS (COCOS NUCIFERA) UND ZWIEBEL (ALLIUM CEPA) ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PLATTWÜRMERN (PLATHELMINTHES) UND/ODER BANDWÜRMERN (NEMATODEN) BEI TIEREN ODER MENSCHEN
Entry into regional phase03.05.2012National basic fee paid 
03.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/36]
01.11.2012Observations by third parties
10.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
15.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2014Fee for grant paid
06.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.03.2013
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Request for further processing for:15.01.2013Request for further processing filed
15.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.01.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.10.2009
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU08.10.2009
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU08.10.2009
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2016/22]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE08.10.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
Former [2015/18]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]IN188248  ;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 03, Database accession no. 2010-A08585, XP002585050 & IN188248 A1 20020831 (MARKOSE K N) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - HUSSAIN A ET AL, "An account of the botanical anthelmintics used in traditional veterinary practices in Sahiwal district of Punjab, Pakistan", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, vol. 119, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JEP.2008.06.034, ISSN 0378-8741, (20080902), pages 185 - 190, (20080709), XP023904703 [A] 1-16 * tables 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2008.06.034
 [AD]  - OLIVEIRA L M B ET AL, "Anthelmintic activity of Cocos nucifera L. against sheep gastrointestinal nematodes", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 159, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VETPAR.2008.10.018, ISSN 0304-4017, (20090122), pages 55 - 59, (20081015), XP025805188 [AD] 1-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018
 [AD]  - ABU EL EZZ NADIA M T, Effect of Nigella sativa and Allium cepa oils on Trichinella spiralis in experimentally infected rats., JOURNAL OF THE EGYPTIAN SOCIETY OF PARASITOLOGY, (200508), ISSN 0253-5890, XP009134260 [AD] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicant   - "Database WPI, Week 20103"
    - "Aavialikkum Amuthamurai Churukkam, Palani Thandayuthapani Devasthanam pubications", K. MUDALIAR, Directorate of Indian Systems of Medicine, page 53
    - ABU EL EZZ NM, "Effects of Nigella sativa and Allium cepa oils on Trichinella spiralis in experimentally infected rats", I EGYPT SOC PARASITOL, (2005), vol. 35, pages 511 - 523
    - AMORIM A.; BORBA HR, "Acav Antihelmintica de plantas X Testes in- vivo com extratos brutos de Cocos nucifera", REV BRAS FARM, (1994), vol. 75, pages 91 - 92
    - AMORIM A; BORBA HR, "Acav Antihelmintica XI. Influcencia de extractos brutos nucifera", REV BRAS FARM, (1995), vol. 76, pages 98 - 99
    - ATHANASIADOU S.; ELTHIORI J; KYRIAZAKIS I, "Medicinal plants for helminth parasite control: facts and fictions", ANIMAL, (2007), vol. 19, pages 1392 - 1400
    - AYAZ E, TÜREL; GÜL A.; SILMAZ O, "Evaluation of the anthelminthic activity of garlic (Alllum satlvum) in mice naturally infected with Aspiculuris tetraptera", RECENT PAT ANTIINFECT DRUG DISC, (2008), vol. 3, pages 149 - 152
    - BASTIDAS G, "Effects of ingested garlic on Necator americanus and Necator caninum", AM J TROP MET HYG, (1969), vol. 18, pages 920 - 923
    - COSHA CTC; OLIVEIRA LMB; CAMURGA VASCONALOS ALF ET AL., "Atividade antihelminthica de Cocos nucifera", VET. PARASITOL, (2009), vol. 157, pages 211 - 213
    - FAJIMI AK; TAIWO AA, "Herbal remedies in animal parasitic diseases in Nigeria: A review. African J", BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 4, pages 303 - 307, XP009079382
    - GIOVE N, "Traditional medicine in the treatment of enteroparasitosis", REV. GASTROENTEROL. PERU, (1996), vol. 16, pages 197 - 202
    - IQBAL Z; KHAHID-NADEEM Q; KHAN MN; AKTHAR MSS; WARAICH FN, "In vitro anthelmintic activity of Allium sativum, Zingiber officinale and Ficus religios", I. AGRICULT, BIOL., (2001), vol. 3, pages 454 - 457
    - OLIVEIRA LMB ET AL., "Anthelmintic activity of Cocos nucifera against sheep gastrointestinal nematodes", VET. PARASITOL., (2009), vol. 159, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018, pages 55 - 59, XP025805188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2008.10.018
other   - "Karuppa Vayukku Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/17, XP003032007
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, Athhmarakshaamirtham, (1879), page 53
    - "Coconut", TKDL, Database accession no. MA1/65I, XP003032008
    - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ LBN AL-QUFF MASEEHI, Kitaab-al-'Umdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), page 226
    - "Dawa Barae Dood", TKDL, Database accession no. AA11/109, XP003032009
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKAIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1962), vol. XI, page 18
    - "Narikelapuspajalagunaah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4964, XP003032010
    - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara, (1997), vol. IV, page 427
    - "Dawa Basl-ul-faar Bara-e-Kirm-e-Shikam", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/114K, XP003032011
    - MAHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, page 121
    - "Hingula Rasayan Vidhi(2)", TKDL, Database accession no. RS22/700B, XP003032012
    - Rasatanrasarah Evam Siddhaprayogasamgrahah, (1990), page 475
    - "Hab Deegar Qawitar", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/4069, XP003032013
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 613
    - "Vizhi Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. PD04/248, XP003032014
    - AGASTHIYAR, Agathiar Vaithiam, page 128