Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2271541

EP2271541 - USE OF A METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL IN A VEHICLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
31.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100
47166 Duisburg / DE
[2011/02]
Inventor(s)01 / BECKER, Jens-Ulrik
Zieglerstraße 26
47058 Duisburg / DE
02 / PATBERG, Lothar
Friesenstraße 35
47445 Moers / DE
03 / SEYFRIED, Peter
Wichertstraße 40
10439 Berlin / DE
04 / TAMLER, Horst Walter
Markerbenhöhe 10
58453 Witten / DE
05 / WUNDERLICH, Roland
Augustus Straße 4
59192 Bergkamen / DE
 [2015/36]
Former [2011/02]01 / BECKER, Jens-Ulrik
Zieglerstraße 26
47058 Duisburg / DE
02 / PATBERG, Lothar
Gallierring 84
47445 Moers / DE
03 / SEYFRIED, Peter
Borsigstraße 3
44145 Dortmund / DE
04 / TAMLER, Horst Walter
Markerbenhöhe 10
58453 Witten / DE
05 / WUNDERLICH, Roland
Augustus Straße 4
59192 Bergkamen / DE
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2015/36]
Former [2011/02]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
DE-40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date09741997.227.04.2009
[2011/02]
WO2009EP55053
Priority number, dateDE2008102270907.05.2008         Original published format: DE102008022709
[2011/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009135779
Date:12.11.2009
Language:DE
[2009/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2271541
Date:12.01.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2271541
Date:02.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:B62D29/00, B32B15/01
[2011/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2011/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES METALLISCHEN VERBUNDWERKSTOFFS IN EINER FAHRZEUGSTRUKTUR[2011/02]
English:USE OF A METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL IN A VEHICLE STRUCTURE[2011/02]
French:UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE MÉTALLIQUE DANS UNE STRUCTURE DE VÉHICULE[2011/02]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2010National basic fee paid 
18.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/02]
24.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2015Fee for grant paid
23.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Voestalpine Stahl GmbH
Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3
4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
HGF Europe LLP
Neumarkter Str. 18
81673 München / DE
 [2019/21]
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Voestalpine Stahl GmbH
Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3
4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neumarkter Strasse 18
81673 München / DE
Former [2018/13]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Voestalpine Stahl GmbH
Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3
4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Jell, Friedrich
Bismarckstrasse 9
4020 Linz / AT
Former [2018/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Voestalpine Stahl GmbH
Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3
4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neumarkter Strasse 18
81673 München / DE
Former [2016/28]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2016   
Voestalpine Stahl GmbH
Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3
4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Jell, Friedrich
Bismarckstrasse 9
4020 Linz / AT
07.07.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0231/18
27.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
22.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0231/18
26.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.04.2009
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE27.04.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU27.04.2009
CY02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE27.04.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/29]HU27.04.2009
CY02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE27.04.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU27.04.2009
CY02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE27.04.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/38]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE27.04.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
LU27.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
LU27.04.2016
Former [2016/52]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/43]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/39]DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/36]EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/34]EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT02.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0596133  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 3 - line 26 * * page 3, line 28 - line 30 * * page 5, line 14 - line 20 *;
 [A]EP1060874  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 * * column 2, paragraph 8 * * column 3, paragraph 11; figure - *
ExaminationJPH03133630
OppositionUS2874082
 WO2008013233
 US2010003540
 DE10136433
    - Werkstoffdatenblatt nach DIN EN 10088-2: 1.4021 Stahl allgemeines Fachwissen
    - "Correlation of Yield Strength allgemeines Fachwissen and Tensile Strength with Hardness for Steels", JMEPEP, (20080000), vol. 17, pages 888 - 893, XP055290035
    - E-Mail von Herrn Guido Tischler
    - Katalog der Deutschen Nationalbibliothek, ISSN 1612-2763