Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2274596

EP2274596 - COMPENSATOR FOR MULTIPLE SURFACE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[2014/34]
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
9885 Towne Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FENG, Wenyi
9885 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
02 / BRYANT, Jason
Chesterford Research Park Nr Saffron Walden
Little Chesterford CB10 1XL / GB
03 / BUERMANN, Dale
25861 Industrial Boulevard
Hayward CA 94545 / US
 [2011/03]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09743421.105.05.2009
[2011/03]
WO2009US42778
Priority number, dateUS2009043449501.05.2009         Original published format: US 434495
US2008005052205.05.2008         Original published format: US 50522
US2008013844417.12.2008         Original published format: US 138444
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009137435
Date:12.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2274596
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009
[2011/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/05, G01N21/64, G02B21/00
[2011/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
TitleGerman:KOMPENSATOR FÜR MEHROBERFLÄCHENABBILDUNG[2011/03]
English:COMPENSATOR FOR MULTIPLE SURFACE IMAGING[2011/03]
French:COMPENSATEUR POUR IMAGERIE DE SURFACES MULTIPLES[2011/03]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2010National basic fee paid 
02.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
26.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.04.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination13.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2069/17
18.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2004248287  (HU QIANJIN [US] ET AL) [Y] 20,21,23-27 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0011] , [0013] , [0120]; figure 10b * [A] 1-19;
 [YA]US2006253035  (STERN DAVID [US]) [Y] 20,21,23-27 * paragraphs [0112] , [0115] , [0122] , [0127]; figure 4 * [A] 1;
 [A]DE10014204  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0010] , [0011]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2004096831  (HUGHES OWEN P L [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0066]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2007114362  (FENG WENYI [US] ET AL) [A] 24 * paragraph [0056] *