blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2271724 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2271724



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2754
06.06.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.06.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.05.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.05.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
27.05.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
25.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
25.03.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
06.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.03.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.03.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.02.2019 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 4
14.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
22.01.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
14.12.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 3
31.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
23.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
23.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 77
23.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
23.08.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
14.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
13.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.08.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
13.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
13.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
13.06.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 20
08.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.02.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.12.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
11.10.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
13.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
10.04.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
05.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
29.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.03.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.03.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 56
03.03.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 7
21.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 7
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Description Appeal 7
21.11.2016 Description Appeal 7
21.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 72
21.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 12
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 4
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 8
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 5
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 4
21.11.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 64
21.11.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
21.11.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.11.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
21.11.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
13.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.09.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
22.09.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.09.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
11.07.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
11.07.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 22
11.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 60
01.06.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.05.2016 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
11.05.2016 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.05.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 9
10.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 75
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 6
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Claims Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
29.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
29.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
29.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
29.04.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.04.2016 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 31
27.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
27.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
27.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
27.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
27.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
29.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.03.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
29.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
15.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.11.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
20.08.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 2
19.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
10.07.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.04.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
03.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
23.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.07.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.04.2014 Refund of fees Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Request for documents Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
28.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
24.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
21.01.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
14.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
14.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
14.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.03.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 5
02.10.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.09.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.09.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
10.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Description Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.04.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.03.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
02.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
02.11.2011 Description Search / examination 1
02.11.2011 Description Search / examination 3
02.11.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
31.10.2011 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
26.08.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.08.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.12.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 15
14.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.10.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
14.10.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
17.09.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.12.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
12.11.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 7
12.11.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
08.10.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
08.10.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.10.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 10
25.05.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
25.05.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 1
25.05.2009 Description International Searching Authority 24
25.05.2009 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 3
25.05.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 1