blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2271724


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.06.2019 Revocation of patent published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
24.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.03.2019 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
08.06.2018 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2018 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.11.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
23.09.2016 Change: Appeal number
23.09.2016 New entry: Appeal number
23.09.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
10.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
20.05.2016 Change - applicant published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
01.04.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
27.01.2016 Change - representative
28.08.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
09.07.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
29.06.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2015 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
20.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
22.09.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.07.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
05.03.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
31.01.2014 Opposition filed published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
17.01.2014 Opposition filed published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
26.04.2013 Change - priority published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
19.04.2013 Change - divisional application(s) published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
22.03.2013 (Expected) grant published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
19.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.11.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.11.2012 Change - French title published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
05.10.2012 Change - German title published on  07.11.2012  [2012/45]
05.10.2012 Change - English title published on  07.11.2012  [2012/45]
05.10.2012 Change - French title published on  07.11.2012  [2012/45]
25.09.2012 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
21.04.2012 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.11.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.08.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2011 First examination report
15.04.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.04.2011 Change - extension states published on  18.05.2011  [2011/20]
10.12.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2011  [2011/02]
10.12.2010 Request for examination filed published on  12.01.2011  [2011/02]
18.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
25.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
25.10.2010 Amendment by applicant
04.12.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
13.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication