blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2271724 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09743642 EP13164159



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8692037Global Dossier 08.04.2014B2
US2013068989 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
US201213408686 29.02.2012
US201213676217 14.11.2012
US43701409 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8333902Global Dossier 18.12.2012B2
US2012165578 28.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
US201213408686 29.02.2012
US43701409 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8147709Global Dossier 03.04.2012B2
US2009278075 12.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
US43701409 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190015607Global Dossier 13.02.2019A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101946315BGlobal Dossier 11.02.2019B1
KR20180001570 04.01.2018A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101822320BGlobal Dossier 25.01.2018B1
KR20160103141 31.08.2016A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2011520016Global Dossier 14.07.2011A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2617794Global Dossier 15.06.2016A3
EP2617794 24.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
EP09743642 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2719741Global Dossier 07.11.2017C
CA2719741 12.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2271724Global Dossier 24.04.2013B1
EP2271724 12.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009244263B 22.05.2014B2
AU2009244263 18.11.2010A2
AU2009244263 12.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014208303B 31.08.2017B2
AU2014208303 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
AU2014208303 04.08.2014
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
AU2009244263 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0907676 21.11.2018B1
BRPI0907676 14.07.2015A2
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2951305 12.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
CA2719741 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102015956B 11.06.2014B
CN102015956 13.04.2011A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2421231T 29.08.2013T3
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1153220 15.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX355723 27.04.2018B
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2010012145 17.12.2010A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
WO2009US43111 07.05.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009137656Global Dossier 12.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101650208BGlobal Dossier 22.08.2016B1
KR20110008314 26.01.2011A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2015212385Global Dossier 26.11.2015A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103937460 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2010149957 20.06.2012A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG193153 30.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201707156R 30.10.2017A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201707158Q 30.10.2017A
Priority number Date
US12681308 07.05.2008
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2617794