Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2271724

EP2271724 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUOROPROPENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/02]COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 1,1,1,2,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE OR 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUOROPROPENE
[2012/45]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2016/25]
Former [2011/02]For all designated states
E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAHLER, Barry, Asher
104 Carter Way
Glen Mills, PA 19342 / US
02 / NAPPA, Mario, Joseph
3 Oakridge Court
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / KNAPP, Jeffrey, P.
910 Glackens Lane
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
 [2011/02]
Representative(s)Morf, Jan Stefan
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Arabellastrasse 17
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2011/02]Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date09743642.207.05.2009
[2011/02]
WO2009US43111
Priority number, dateUS20080126813P07.05.2008         Original published format: US 126813 P
[2013/22]
Former [2011/02]US2008012681307.05.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009137656
Date:12.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2271724
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2271724
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:C09K3/30, C09K5/04, C08J9/14, C07C17/25
[2011/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/02]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUORPROPEN[2012/45]
English:COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUOROPROPENE[2012/45]
French:COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DU 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUOROPROPENE[2012/49]
Former [2011/02]ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT 1,1,1,2,3-PENTAFLUORPROPAN ODER 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUORPROPEN
Former [2011/02]COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 1,1,1,2,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE OR 2,3,3,3- TETRAFLUOROPROPENE
Former [2011/02]COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DU 1,1,1,2,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE OU DU 2,3,3,3- TÉTRAFLUOROPROPÈNE
Entry into regional phase14.10.2010National basic fee paid 
14.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/02]
20.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2012
16.10.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2013Fee for grant paid
15.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13164159.9  / EP2617794
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  24.01.2014   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  24.01.2014   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/18]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  24.01.2014   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  24.01.2014   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
 02  24.01.2014   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 03  24.01.2014   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Departement propriété industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
 02  24.01.2014   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  24.01.2014   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2014   
ARKEMA FRANCE
Departement propriété industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
05.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
12.03.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/28]
Appeal following opposition19.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2172/16
21.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
12.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2009
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE07.05.2013
LU07.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE07.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2015/13]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
IE07.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
IE07.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/08]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006243944  (MINOR BARBARA H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-3,14,15,21; table 9 *;
 [X]US2008058562  (PETROV VIACHESLAV A [US], et al) [X] 1 * example - *;
 [X]US2005233932  (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,5 *;
 [X]WO2008030439  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 3 * example 3 *;
 [X]GB2440258  (INEOS FLUOR HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * table 1 *;
 [X]DE202007008291U  (INEOS FLUOR HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2007117391  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * table 3 *;
 [X]GB2439392  (INEOS FLUOR HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * claims 1,2,4 *;
 [X]US2002003224  (HUGHES H MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 3 * claims 1,6,12 *;
 [X]US5800729  (WILSON DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 3 * claims 1,10-13 *;
 [X]USRE37938E  (MINOR BARBARA HAVILAND [US], et al) [X] 3 * column 4, lines 37-39 * * claim 7 *;
 [X]US5616275  (CHISOLM TUNEEN E C [US], et al) [X] 3 * column 2, lines 18-23 * * column 4, lines 62-64 * * examples 2,4 *;
 [A]US5954995  (GOBLE GEORGE H [US]) [A] 1 * table 1 *;
 [A]US2006179852  (THOMAS RAYMOND H [US], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0132323  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 3 * claim 3 *
ExaminationWO2007145171
 EP2028172
by applicantUS2006243944
OppositionWO2010050373
 WO2008030440
 US2007100175
 US8147709
    - Declaration of Andrew Weir
    - Experimental data showing gas chromatograph (GC) elution times of 3,3,3- trifluoropropyne (TFMA) and chloropentafluoroethane (CFC-115
    - "Fluorine in Organic Chemistry", Blackwell/CRC Chambers, (20040000), pages 167 - 169
    - BROWN et al., "radiation induced polymerization at high pressure of 2,3,3,3, tetrafluoropropene in bulk and with tetrafluoroethylene", J Pol Sci A-1, (19710000), vol. 9, pages 1993 - 2007, XP008118218

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1971.150090717
    - ARI 2006 Standard
    - RALPH C DOWNING, Fluorocarbon Refrigerants Handbook, (19880000), ISBN 0-13-322504-6, XP055276475