Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2320821

EP2320821 - SYSTEMS FOR TREATING A BRONCHIAL TREE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/20]SYSTEMS, ASSEMBLIES, AND METHODS FOR TREATING A BRONCHIAL TREE
[2012/19]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Change - applicantpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuvaira, Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North, Suite 105
Plymouth MN 55447 / US
[2018/44]
Former [2013/20]For all designated states
Holaira, Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North, Suite 105
Plymouth, MN 55447 / US
Former [2012/45]For all designated states
Innovative Pulmonary Solutions, Inc.
1750 112th Avenue NE, Suite D255
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
Former [2011/20]For all designated states
Innovative Pulmonary Solutions, Inc.
12180 Northeast 32nd Place
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DIMMER, Steven, C.
12810 Northeast 32nd Place
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
02 / MAYSE, Martin, L.
7360 Teasdale Avenue
University City, MO 63130 / US
 [2011/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2011/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09743805.508.05.2009
[2011/20]
WO2009US43393
Priority number, dateUS20080052082P09.05.2008         Original published format: US 52082 P
US20080106490P17.10.2008         Original published format: US 106490 P
US20090155449P25.02.2009         Original published format: US 155449 P
[2011/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009137819
Date:12.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2320821
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009
[2011/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2320821
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/12, A61N7/02, A61B18/02, A61B18/18, A61B18/24, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61B18/12, A61B18/14
[2015/19]
Former International [2011/20]A61B18/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/20]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES BRONCHIALBAUMS[2012/19]
English:SYSTEMS FOR TREATING A BRONCHIAL TREE[2012/19]
French:SYSTÈME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN ARBRE BRONCHIQUE[2012/19]
Former [2011/20]SYSTEME, ANORDNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES BRONCHIALBAUMS
Former [2011/20]SYSTEMS, ASSEMBLIES, AND METHODS FOR TREATING A BRONCHIAL TREE
Former [2011/20]SYSTÈMES, ENSEMBLES ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISABLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN ARBRE BRONCHIQUE
Entry into regional phase09.12.2010National basic fee paid 
09.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/20]
02.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2012Fee for grant paid
11.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12005299.8  / EP2529686
EP13003665.0  / EP2662046
EP13003666.8  / EP2662027
EP13003667.6  / EP2662116
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
30.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1409/15
08.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.05.2009
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MK24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
LU08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MK24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/13]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/36]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
Former [2013/20]NO24.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US6488673  (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 52-67 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 37 * * column 29, line 3 - column 37, line 65; figures 44,57,58,66-68 *;
 [A]US2005187579  (DANEK CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 53,58 * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]US2002111620  (COOPER JOEL D [US], et al) [A] 52-67 * paragraphs [0094] - [0097]; figures 5E-5K *
ExaminationUS4658836