Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2373907

EP2373907 - DAMPING DEVICE HAVING CENTRIFUGAL FORCE PENDULUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.01.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / REIK, Wolfgang
Sonnhalde 8
77815 Bühl / DE
02 / MENDE, Hartmut
Merkelbuckel 45
77815 Bühl / DE
03 / KROLL, Jürgen
Honaustrasse 31
77815 Bühl / DE
04 / KOOY, Ad
Metzenhalde 2
77886 Lauf / DE
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date09743840.224.09.2009
WO2009DE01343
Priority number, dateDE2008106069208.12.2008         Original published format: DE102008060692
DE2009102973022.06.2009         Original published format: DE102009029730
[2011/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010066218
Date:17.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2373907
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2373907
Date:16.04.2014
Language:DE
[2014/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/134, F16F15/14
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DÄMPFUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT FLIEHKRAFTPENDEL[2011/41]
English:DAMPING DEVICE HAVING CENTRIFUGAL FORCE PENDULUM[2011/41]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT AVEC PENDULE À FORCE CENTRIFUGE[2011/41]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2011National basic fee paid 
08.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
30.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2014Fee for grant paid
03.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.01.2015   
Valeo Embrayages
Propriété Intellectuelle
81 Avenue Roger Dumoulin
80009 AMIENS CEDEX 2 / FR
 [2015/08]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0714/17
23.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
31.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.09.2009
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MK16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
TR16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU24.09.2009
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
TR16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU24.09.2009
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
SM16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/12]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT24.09.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
GB24.09.2014
IE24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/36]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
GB24.09.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/30]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU24.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/22]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU24.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/18]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
IT16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/10]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/08]CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/02]CY16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY16.04.2014
ES16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY16.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE10224874  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [I] 2;
 [A]EP1744074  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 15 *;
 [A]DE102004011830  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *