Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2491694

EP2491694 - METHOD FOR MANAGING ACCESS TO PROTECTED RESOURCES IN A COMPUTER NETWORK, PHYSICAL ENTITIES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 22.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 12.04.2017  [2017/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MONJAS LLORENTE, Miguel Angel
C/ Embajadores
177 esc. F, 4°D
E-28045 Madrid / ES
02 / DEL ÁLAMO RAMIRO, José Maria
Rio Tajo 6 10-B
E-28923 Alcorcon (Madrid) / ES
03 / YELMO GARCÍA, Juan Carlos
Hortensia 8
E-28933 Móstoles (Madrid) / ES
 [2012/35]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/52]
Former [2012/35]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date09744668.622.10.2009
[2015/52]
WO2009EP63891
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011047722
Date:28.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2491694
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2491694
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/33
[2015/31]
Former International [2012/35]H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU GESCHÜTZTEN RESSOURCEN IN EINEM COMPUTERNETZ, PHYSIKALISCHE EINHEITEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME DAFÜR[2012/35]
English:METHOD FOR MANAGING ACCESS TO PROTECTED RESOURCES IN A COMPUTER NETWORK, PHYSICAL ENTITIES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS THEREFOR[2012/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE L'ACCÈS À DES RESSOURCES PROTÉGÉES DANS UN RÉSEAU INFORMATIQUE, ENTITÉS PHYSIQUES ET PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES ASSOCIÉS[2012/35]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2012National basic fee paid 
14.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
14.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2015Fee for grant paid
15.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2014
Opposition(s)26.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
[2017/15]
Former [2017/03]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT23.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US6253202  (GILMOUR DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 38 * * claims 1,3,15 *;
 [A]US2003084300  (KOIKE YUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US7076558  (DUNN MELISSA W [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 10, line 52 - line 59 * * column 15, line 35 - line 40 *
 [X]  - Jose Ted, "OAuth project review, 29 jan 2009", OAuth Minutes, (20090129), URL: http://www.w3.org/2009/01/29-oauth-minutes, (20100304), XP002570264 [X] 1-15 * Topic 1. Introduction, OAuth spec Topic 4. Browser Handling of Redirection *
 [A]  - WANG BIN ET AL, "Open Identity Management Framework for SaaS Ecosystem", E-BUSINESS ENGINEERING, 2009. ICEBE '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091021), ISBN 978-0-7695-3842-6, pages 512 - 517, XP031571864 [A] 1-15 * abstract chapters III. C., IV. B., IV.D. 4) figure 6 *