Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2291745

EP2291745 - METHOD AND MEDIUM FOR REMOTE TRACKING OF USER INTERACTION WITH A WEBPAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/10]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REMOTE TRACKING AND REPLAY OF USER INTERACTION WITH A WEBPAGE
[2013/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Foresee Results
250 Green Road, Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
[2011/10]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITE, Alexei, R.
1303-183 Keefer Place
Vancouver British Columbia BC V6G 6B9 / CA
02 / CHARLAND, Andre, D.
3404 Calder Avenue
North Vancouver BritishColumbia BC V7N 3R7 / CA
03 / JOHNSON, David, C.
1280 East 14th Ave
Vancouver, BC V5t2p3 / CA
04 / COHEN, Mitchell, A.
4877 South Ridgeside Circle
Ann Arbor MI 48105 / US
 [2011/19]
Former [2011/10]01 / WHITE, Alexei, R.
1303-183 Keefer Place
Vancouver British Columbia BC V6G 6B9 / CA
02 / CHARLAND, Andre, D.
3404 Calder Avenue
North Vancouver BritishColumbia BC V7N 3R7 / CA
03 / JOHNSON, David, C.
183 E. 27th Avenue
Vancouver British Columbia BC V5V 2K7 / CA
04 / COHEN, Mitchell, A.
4877 South Ridgeside Circle
Ann Arbor MI 48105 / US
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2011/10]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date09747080.110.04.2009
[2011/10]
WO2009US40194
Priority number, dateUS20080124392P15.04.2008         Original published format: US 124392 P
[2011/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009139994
Date:19.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2291745
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009
[2011/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2291745
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/30, G06F17/30
[2011/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MEDIUM ZUR FERNGESTEUERTEN VERFOLGUNG VON BENUTZERINTERAKTION EN ZU EINER WEBSEITE[2013/05]
English:METHOD AND MEDIUM FOR REMOTE TRACKING OF USER INTERACTION WITH A WEBPAGE[2013/05]
French:MÉTHODE ET MEDIUM POUR LE SUIVI À DISTANCE DES INTERACTIONS D'UN UTILISATEUR AVEC UNE PAGE WEB[2013/05]
Former [2011/10]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERNGESTEUERTEN VERFOLGUNG UND WIEDERGABE DER BENUTZERINTERAKTION MIT EINER WEBSEITE
Former [2011/10]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REMOTE TRACKING AND REPLAY OF USER INTERACTION WITH A WEBPAGE
Former [2011/10]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE SUIVI À DISTANCE ET LA RÉPÉTITION D'UNE INTERACTION D'UN UTILISATEUR AVEC UNE PAGE WEB
Entry into regional phase11.11.2010National basic fee paid 
11.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/10]
24.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2013Fee for grant paid
16.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13003350.9  / EP2650790
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2011
Opposition(s)04.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2009
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MK03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU10.04.2009
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2016/32]HU10.04.2009
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2016/28]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2016/16]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/52]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI03.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2006123340  (BAILEY MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0019] - [0036] - [0045] * [A] 9-11,15-17;
 [XA]US2008040473  (LARSSON JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-14 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0025] - [0037] * [A] 9-11,15-17;
 [A]US2002083145  (PERINPANATHAN NISHANTHAN M T [CA]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0030] - [0034] - [0040] - [0042] *;
 [A]US2007250618  (HAMMOND STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015] - [0042] , [0057] *;
 [X]US6877007  (HENTZEL ANNA M [US], et al) [X] 9-11,15-30 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 28 * * column 9, line 6 - column 10, line 41 * * column 13, line 39 - column 14, line 67 *;
 [X]WO0137125  (CONTIGO SOFTWARE [US]) [X] 9-11,15-30 * page 1, line 13 - line 17 * * page 4, line 4 - page 10, line 17 *;
 [X]WO0186483  (TSO KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 9-11,15-30 * page 1, line 17 - page 4, line 11 * * page 6, line 31 - page 9, line 14 *
ExaminationUS2008052392
by applicantUS2006123340
 US2008040473
 US6877007