Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2300004

EP2300004 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO HEAT SHOCK TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS AND TARGETS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duke University
2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306
Durham, NC 27705 / US
[2011/13]
Inventor(s)01 / THIELE, Dennis, J.
2705 Creek Riadge Lane
Chapel Hill NC 27514 / US
02 / NEEF, Daniel, W.
3 Addison Court
Durham NC 27712 / US
 [2011/13]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]Witte, Weller & Partner
Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/13]Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstraße 5
D-70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09747702.015.05.2009
[2011/13]
WO2009US44186
Priority number, dateUS20080053513P15.05.2008         Original published format: US 53513 P
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009140621
Date:19.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2300004
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/415, A61K31/4155, A61K31/426, A61P25/28, A61P25/16, A61P35/00, C07D277/38, C07D277/60, A61K45/06
[2012/21]
Former International [2011/13]A61K31/415, A61K31/4155, A61K31/426, A61P25/28, A61P25/16, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/13]
Extension statesAL14.12.2010
BA14.12.2010
RS14.12.2010
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT HITZESCHOCK-TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTOR-AKTIVIERENDEN VERBINDUNGEN UND ZIELE DAFÜR[2011/13]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO HEAT SHOCK TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS AND TARGETS THEREOF[2011/13]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS AYANT TRAIT AUX COMPOSÉS ACTIVANT LE FACTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION DE CHOC THERMIQUE ET CIBLES CORRESPONDANTES[2011/13]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2010National basic fee paid 
14.12.2010Search fee paid 
14.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/13]
27.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/30]
15.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2004110350  (NEUROGENETICS INC [US]; CHENG SOAN [US]; COMER DANIEL D [US]; MAO LONG) [X] 2-6,10-14 * abstract * * page 130; table 11; compound 114 * * claims 1-42 * [Y] 1-6,10-15;
 [XY]WO2005026137  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]; MILLER MARK T [US]; HADIDA RUAH SARA S [US]; SINGH) [X] 2-6,10-14 * abstract * * page 80; compound 21 * * page 104; compound 69 * * page 149; compound 162 * * claims 1,219,220 * [Y] 1-6,10-15;
 [XY]WO2006013054  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; CAI JIANPING [US]; FIROOZNIA FARIBORZ [US]; GU) [X] 2-6,10-14 * abstract * * N-(8H-lndeno[1 ,2-d]thiazol-2-yl)-benzamide;; claims 1-10,15-21 * [Y] 1-6,10-15;
 [Y]WO2005041879  (PHARMACIA CORP [US]; MASFERRER JAIME L [US]; PENNING THOMAS D [US]; WA) [Y] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 17; table 1; compounds 13-15,137,165,174 * * claims 1-25 *;
 [Y]WO2005044194  (PHARMACIA CORP [US]; MASFERRER JAIME L [US]; PENNING THOMAS D [US]; WA) [Y] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 18; table 1; compounds 13-15,137,165,174 * * claims 1-29 *;
 [A]  - SALEHI A H ET AL, "AEG3482 Is an Antiapoptotic Compound that Inhibits Jun Kinase Activity and Cell Death through Induced Expression of Heat Shock Protein 70", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CHEMBIOL.2005.11.012, ISSN 1074-5521, (20060201), pages 213 - 223, (20060201), XP025131819 [A] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 214; figure 1a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2005.11.012
 [A]  - TROTT AMY ET AL, "Activation of heat shock and antioxidant responses by the natural product celastrol: Transcriptional signatures of a thiol-targeted molecule", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, (200803), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1059-1524, pages 1104 - 1112, XP002673716 [A] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 1104, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1105, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1091/MBC.E07-10-1004
 [A]  - BATULAN Z ET AL, "Induction of multiple heat shock proteins and neuroprotection in a primary culture model of familial amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.NBD.2006.06.017, ISSN 0969-9961, (20061101), pages 213 - 225, (20061101), XP024901478 [A] 1-6,10-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbd.2006.06.017
 [A]  - POWERS ET AL, "Inhibitors of the heat shock response: Biology and pharmacology", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070731), vol. 581, no. 19, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2007.05.040, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 3758 - 3769, XP022191504 [A] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 3758, column r, paragraph 3 - page 3760, column l, line 4 * * page 3766, column r, line 12 - line 43 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2007.05.040
 [A]  - WESTERHEIDE SANDY D ET AL, "Heat shock response modulators as therapeutic tools for diseases of protein conformation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, (20050901), vol. 280, no. 39, doi:10.1074/JBC.R500010200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 33097 - 33100, XP002637231 [A] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 33098; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.R500010200
 [XY]  - LEONE S ET AL, "SAR and QSAR study on 2-aminothiazole derivatives, modulators of transcriptional repression in Huntington's disease", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 16, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2008.03.067, ISSN 0968-0896, (20080330), pages 5695 - 5703, (20080330), XP022673151 [X] 2-6,10-14 * abstract * * page 5697; table 1; compound E * [Y] 1-6,10-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.03.067
 [Y]  - GALAM ET AL, "High-throughput assay for the identification of Hsp90 inhibitors based on Hsp90-dependent refolding of firefly luciferase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20070131), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2007.01.004, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1939 - 1946, XP005867161 [Y] 1-6,10-15 * abstract * * page 1940, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1942; figure 5; compounds 7,8,15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2007.01.004
 [T]  - DANIEL W. NEEF ET AL, "Heat shock transcription factor 1 as a therapeutic target in neurodegenerative diseases", NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (20110101), vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nrd3453, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 930 - 944, XP055024215 [T] 1-6,10-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd3453
 [T]  - NEEF DANIEL W ET AL, "Modulation of Heat Shock Transcription Factor 1 as a Therapeutic Target for Small Molecule Intervention in Neurodegenerative Disease", PLOS BIOLOGY, (201001), vol. 8, no. 1, XP002673717 [T] 1-6,10-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PBIO.1000291
International search[X]WO2007120343  (NEW YOURK UNIVERSITY);
 [X]WO2005041879  (PHARMACIA CORPORATION);
 [X]WO2005044194  (PHARMACIA CORPORATION);
 [X]WO2005000300  (VERNALIS (CAMBRIDGE) LIMITED, CANCER RESEARCH TECHNOLOGY LTD., THE INS)
 [X]  - LAKSHMI GALAM ET AL., "High-throughput assay for the identification of Hsp90 inhibitors based on Hsp90-dependent refolding of firefly luciferase.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., (2007), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1939 - 1946, XP005867161

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2007.01.004