blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2323642 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2323642



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 513
05.01.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.02.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.12.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.12.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.12.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.10.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 104
14.10.2013 Annex Search / examination 2
14.10.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 9
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
08.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
08.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 14
08.10.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 31
08.10.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 12
02.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
30.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.04.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 21
30.04.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
30.04.2013 Annex Search / examination 13
30.04.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
30.04.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
30.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2013 Description Search / examination 7
30.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.03.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.11.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.09.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.12.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.03.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
04.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.03.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.03.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 27
04.03.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 32
04.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
04.03.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.01.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.03.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
04.03.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.03.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
09.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
09.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
28.10.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2009 Annex International Searching Authority 17
28.10.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 2
28.10.2009 Description International Searching Authority 16
28.10.2009 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 6