Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2323642


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
05.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
26.12.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
17.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
10.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.10.2013 New entry: Observations by third parties
04.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.08.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.08.2013 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.08.2013 Change - German title published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
16.08.2013 Change - English title published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
16.08.2013 Change - French title published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
06.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.03.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.11.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.11.2012 First examination report published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
04.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
22.04.2011 Request for examination filed published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
29.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.2011 Amendment by applicant
09.03.2011 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
19.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
24.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication