Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2323642
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011152219Global Dossier 23.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20110046567Global Dossier 04.05.2011A
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2012500844Global Dossier 12.01.2012A
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2323642Global Dossier 19.02.2014B1
EP2323642 25.05.2011A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009286285B 26.03.2015B2
AU2009286285 04.03.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0910368 13.10.2015A2
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102164592B 23.09.2015B
CN102164592 24.08.2011A
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2323642T 05.05.2014T3
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA022055 30.10.2015B1
EA201100393 31.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2460578T 13.05.2014T3
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL211448 31.05.2016A
IL211448D 31.05.2011D0
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2011002234 05.04.2011A
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
WO2009IT00392 27.08.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010023705Global Dossier 04.03.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EA023607 30.06.2016B1
EA201300272 30.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1393402 20.04.2012B1
ITRM20080472 28.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE02872011 15.05.2011A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2323642E 15.05.2014E
Priority number Date
ITRM20080472 28.08.2008