Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2323642

EP2323642 - Use of EDTA+tromethamine or of photoenhancers, associated to riboflavin for corneal cross-linking in the treatment of the keratoconus or of other corneal ectasic disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/21]USE OF ENHANCERS, POSSIBLY ASSOCIATED TO RIBOFLAVIN, AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS FOR CORNEAL CROSS-LINKING IN THE TREATMENT OF THE KERATOCONUS OR OF OTHER CORNEAL ECTASIC DISORDERS
[2013/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sooft Italia S.p.A.
Contrada Molino, 17
63833 Montegiorgio (FM) / IT
[2014/08]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Sooft Italia Spa
Contrada Molino, 17
63025 Montegiorgio / IT
Inventor(s)01 / STAGNI, Marcello
Via A. S. Fulci, 31G
I-95127 Catania / IT
02 / STAGNI, Edoardo
Via A. S. Fulci, 31G
I-95127 Catania / IT
03 / FILIPPELLO, Massimo
Corso Italia 22
I-95129 Catania / IT
04 / CAVALLO, Giovanni
Via delle Tartane 45
I-00122 Roma / IT
05 / SODO, Eugenio
Piazza Eschilo 10
I-00125 Roma / IT
 [2011/21]
Representative(s)Sarpi, Maurizio , et al
Studio Ferrario S.r.l.
Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]Sarpi, Maurizio , et al
Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date09748494.327.08.2009
[2011/21]
WO2009IT00392
Priority number, dateIT2008RM0047228.08.2008         Original published format: IT RM20080472
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010023705
Date:04.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2323642
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2323642
Date:19.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Search report(s)International search reportEP04.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/14, A61K31/19, A61K31/195, A61K31/352, A61K31/473, A61K31/49, A61K31/5415, A61K31/56, A61K31/60, A61P27/02
[2011/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
Extension statesAL04.03.2011
BA04.03.2011
RS04.03.2011
TitleGerman:Verwendung von EDTA+Tromethamine oder von Photoverstärkungsmitteln, im Zusammenhang mit Riboflavin, zur Hornhautvernetzung bei der Behandlung von Keratokonus oder anderen ektatischen Hornhauterkrankungen[2013/38]
English:Use of EDTA+tromethamine or of photoenhancers, associated to riboflavin for corneal cross-linking in the treatment of the keratoconus or of other corneal ectasic disorders[2013/38]
French:Utilisation de EDTA+tromethamine ou de photoactivateurs, associés à la riboflavine, pour la réticulation cornéenne dans le traitement du kératocône ou d'autres maladies ectasiques de la cornée[2013/38]
Former [2011/21]VERWENDUNG VON VERSTÄRKUNGSMITTELN, MÖGLICHERWEISE IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT RIBOFLAVIN, UND ENTSPRECHENDE OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HORNHAUTVERNETZUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KERATOKONUS ODER ANDEREN EKTATISCHEN HORNHAUTERKRANKUNGEN
Former [2011/21]USE OF ENHANCERS, POSSIBLY ASSOCIATED TO RIBOFLAVIN, AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS FOR CORNEAL CROSS-LINKING IN THE TREATMENT OF THE KERATOCONUS OR OF OTHER CORNEAL ECTASIC DISORDERS
Former [2011/21]UTILISATION D'ACTIVATEURS, ÉVENTUELLEMENT ASSOCIÉS À LA RIBOFLAVINE, AINSI QUE COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES CORRESPONDANTES POUR LA RÉTICULATION CORNÉENNE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU KÉRATOCÔNE OU D'AUTRES MALADIES ECTASIQUES DE LA CORNÉE
Entry into regional phase04.03.2011National basic fee paid 
04.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/21]
02.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2013Observations by third parties
30.12.2013Fee for grant paid
30.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2012
Opposition(s)20.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.08.2009
BG19.02.2014
CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
MT19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SI19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
SM19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
LU27.08.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]BG19.02.2014
CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
MT19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SI19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
SM19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
LU27.08.2014
Former [2016/22]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SI19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
SM19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
LU27.08.2014
Former [2015/24]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SI19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
LU27.08.2014
Former [2015/19]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
LU27.08.2014
Former [2015/18]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
MC19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Former [2014/50]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
SK19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY19.02.2014
CZ19.02.2014
EE19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
HR19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
LV19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.02.2014
FI19.02.2014
LT19.02.2014
SE19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.02.2014
NO19.05.2014
IS19.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004058289  (CHAKSHU RES INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * claims 1,11,43,61,83 * * example 2 *;
 [X]US2006222597  (DUGGER HARRY A III [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] *
 [A]  - WOLLENSAK GREGOR ET AL, "Collagen crosslinking of human and porcine sclera", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, SURGERY, FAIRFAX, VA, (2004), vol. 30, no. 3, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 689 - 695, XP002450030 [A] * page 693, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrs.2003.11.032
 [A]  - SPOERL E, SEILER T., "Techniques for stiffening the cornea", J REFRACT SURG. 1999 NOV-DEC;15(6):711-3, University Eye Clinic, Dresden, Germany., (1999), XP008107084 [A] * page 711, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - SPOERL, "Induction of cross-linking in...", EXP EYE RES, (1998), no. 66, pages 97 - 103, XP008107083 [A] * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.1997.0410
otherUS6537545
 US6174524
    - ASHTON P. ET AL, "Location of penetration and metabolic barriers to levobunolol in the corneal epithelium of the pigmented rabbit", JPET, (199111), vol. 259, pages 719 - 724, XP003032980
    - ROJANASALKUL Y. ET AL, "Mechanisms of action of some penetration enhancers in the cornea: Laser scanningconfocal microscopic and electrophysiology studies", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (19901201), vol. 66, no. 1-3, pages 131 - 142, XP025554544

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(90)90392-H
    - GROSS G.M. ET AL, "EFFECTS OF CALCIUM CHELATING AGENTS ON CORNEAL PERMEABILITY", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE - IOVS, (19850101), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 110 - 113, XP008011241
    - KAUR I.P., "Formulation and evaluation of ophthalmic preparations of acetazolamide", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (20000420), vol. 199, no. 2, pages 119 - 127, XP009092816

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(00)00359-8
    - SHUMYANTSEVA V.V. ET AL, "Photochemical properties of a riboflavins/cytochrome P450 2B4 complex", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (200203), vol. 17, pages 233 - 238, XP055092537

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(01)00181-6
    - CAPOROSSI A. ET AL, "Transepithelial corneal collagen crosslinking for keratoconus: qualitative investigation by in vivo HRT II confocal analysis", EUR J OPHTHALMOL, (2012), vol. SUP 7, pages 81 - 88, XP003032981

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5301/EJO.5000125