Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2358214

EP2358214 - USE OF CANTHAXANTHIN AND/OR 25-OH D3 FOR IMPROVED HATCHABILITY IN POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HERNANDEZ, Jose-Maria
Im Wuhrenberg 17
CH-4312 Magden / CH
02 / WEBER, Gilbert
Im Hofacker 5
CH-4312 Magden / CH
 [2011/34]
Representative(s)Schwander, Kuno , et al
DSM Nutritional Products AG
Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
[2012/28]
Former [2011/34]Schwander, Kuno
DSM Nutritional Products, Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
Application number, filing date09748799.511.11.2009
[2011/34]
WO2009EP64963
Priority number, dateEP2008002015319.11.2008         Original published format: EP 08020153
[2011/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010057811
Date:27.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2358214
Date:24.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010
[2011/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2358214
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/16, A23K1/18
[2011/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON CANTHAXANTHIN UND/ODER 25-OH D3 ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES AUSSCHLÜPFENS IN GEFLÜGEL[2013/27]
English:USE OF CANTHAXANTHIN AND/OR 25-OH D3 FOR IMPROVED HATCHABILITY IN POULTRY[2011/34]
French:UTILISATION DE LA CANTHAXANTHIN ET/OU DU 25-OH D3 POUR L'AMELIORATION DE L'ECLOSION CHEZ LA VOLAILLE[2013/27]
Former [2011/34]VERWENDUNG VON CANTHAXANTHIN UND/ODER 25-OH-D3 ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHLÜPFRATE BEI GEFLÜGEL
Former [2011/34]UTILISATION DE LA CANTHAXANTHINE ET/OU DE 25-OH D3 POUR AMÉLIORER L'ÉCLOSIVITÉ CHEZ DES VOLAILLES
Entry into regional phase03.03.2011National basic fee paid 
03.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
31.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2013Fee for grant paid
16.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.07.2014   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.2014   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
08.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2187/16
25.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
LU11.11.2013
NO01.01.2014
GR03.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
[2016/28]
Former [2016/21]BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
GR02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
LU11.11.2013
NO01.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2015/41]BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
GR02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
LU11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2015/38]BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
GR02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
LU11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2015/34]BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
LU11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2015/32]CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MK02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2015/24]CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SM02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/48]CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IE11.11.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/41]CY02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/33]CY02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/28]CY02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/25]FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/23]FI02.10.2013
HR02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
NO02.01.2014
Former [2014/12]SI02.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0156401  (AVENTIS ANIMAL NUTRITION SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, lines 4-15 * * page 2, lines 1-15 * * claims 1,7-12 *;
 [A]  - Robert F, Panheleux- Le Bastard M, Hamelin C, Boulard C, "Effects of canthaxanthin supplementation in the ROSS breeder diet on oxidative stress of chicks", (20070830), pages 731 - 734, 16th European Symposium on Poultry Nutrition, 26-30/08/2007, URL: http://www.cabi.org/animalscience/Uploads/File/AnimalScience/additionalFiles/WPSAStrasbourgAug2007/64.pdf, (20100128), XP002565950 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * table 2 *
 [A]  - CHANG-HYEUG KIM ET AL, "Effects of dietary xanthophylls and seaweed by-products on growth performance, color and antioxidant properties in broiler chicks", HAN-GUG CHUGSAN SIGPUM HAG-HOEJI - KOREAN SOCIETY FOR FOOD SCIENCE OF ANIMAL RESOURCES, HAN-GUG CHUGSAN SIGPUM HAG-HOEJI, KR, (20040601), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1225-8563, pages 128 - 134, XP009128663 [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PEREZ-VENDRELL AM ET AL, "Influence of source and ratio of xanthophyll pigments on broiler chicken pigmentation and performance", POULTRY SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 80, pages 320 - 326, XP002565951 [A] 1-8 * pages 321-322 * * table 3 *
 [A]  - MCGRAW KJ, KLASING KC, "Carotenoids, immunity, and integumentary coloration in red junglefowl (Gallus Gallus)", THE AUK, (2006), vol. 123, no. 4, pages 1161 - 1171, XP002565952 [A] 1-8 * pages 1162-3 * * pages 1168-9 *
 [A]  - CUCCO M, GUASCO B, MALACARNE G, OTTONELLI R, "Effects of B-carotene on adult immune condition and antibacterial activity in the eggs of the Grey Partridge, Perdix perdix", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 147, no. A, pages 1038 - 1046, XP002565953 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1042 * * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2007.03.014
 [X]  - ATENCIO A ET AL, "TWENTY-FIVE HYDROXYCHOLECALCIFEROL AS A CHOLECALCIFEROL SUBSTITUTE IN BROILER BREEDER HEN DIETS AND ITS EFFECT ON THE PERFORMANCE AND GENERAL HEALTH OF THE PROGENY", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (20050801), vol. 84, no. 8, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1277 - 1285, XP009074311 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * table 1 * * figures 2-4 *
 [XI]  - SOARES J H ET AL, "THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VITAMIN D ANALOG 1 .ALPHA.-OH-D3 IN PROMOTING FERTILITY AND HATCHABILITY IN THE LAYING HEN", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (19790101), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1004 - 1006, XP009074301 [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 1004 * * tables 1,2 * [I] 2-4,6
by applicantUS2003170324
 US2005064018
 US5695794
 US5043170
 WO03007916
 WO03086415