Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2347250

EP2347250 - METHOD FOR SYMMETRY ALIGNMENT OF A CAPACITIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/30]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DIELECTRIC PROPERTY OF A CAPACITOR ARRANGEMENT
[2014/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uster Technologies AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 10
8610 Uster / CH
[2011/30]
Inventor(s)01 / GEHRIG, Reto
Agnesstrasse 12c
8406 Winterthur / CH
 [2011/30]
Application number, filing date09748935.512.10.2009
[2011/30]
WO2009CH00329
Priority number, dateCH2008000164616.10.2008         Original published format: CH 16462008
[2011/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010043065
Date:22.04.2010
Language:DE
[2010/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2347250
Date:27.07.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010
[2011/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2347250
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/22, G01N33/36, G01R27/26
[2011/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DEN SYMMETRIEABGLEICH EINER KAPAZITIVEN VORRICHTUNG[2014/17]
English:METHOD FOR SYMMETRY ALIGNMENT OF A CAPACITIVE DEVICE[2014/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE ALIGNEMENT DE SYMETRIE D'UN DISPOSITIF CAPACITIF[2014/17]
Former [2011/30]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER DIELEKTRISCHEN EIGENSCHAFT EINER KONDENSATORANORDNUNG
Former [2011/30]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DIELECTRIC PROPERTY OF A CAPACITOR ARRANGEMENT
Former [2011/30]DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE PROPRIÉTÉ DIÉLECTRIQUE D'UN ENSEMBLE CONDENSATEUR
Entry into regional phase04.12.2010National basic fee paid 
04.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/30]
07.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2014Fee for grant paid
20.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11000172.4  / EP2352017
EP11000173.2  / EP2352018
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2012
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MK30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
AT12.10.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU12.10.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
AT12.10.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU12.10.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
AT12.10.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
AT12.10.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/12]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
AT12.10.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
IE12.10.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/38]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/36]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/27]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/26]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
LU12.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2004083813  (STERIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7,14-17 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9;
 [XY]DE19850290  (RECHNER IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-2,14-17 * column 2, lines 52-67; figure . * [Y] 9;
 [X]US4772844  (ANDEEN CARL G [US], et al) [X] 1,4,14 * abstract *;
 [X]GB1061635  (INDUSTRIAL NUCLEONICS CORP) [X] 1-2,5,14-17 * page 2, lines 50-119; figure . *;
 [X]US3684954  (JAGGERS HENRY T, et al) [X] 1-2,6,14-17 * abstract *;
 [X]US2001008478  (MCINTOSH ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7,14-17 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 1,5 *;
 [X]DE19535177  (TEMCO TEXTILMASCHKOMPONENT [DE], et al) [X] 1-2,8,14-17 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 18; figure 4 *;
 [X]US3757211  (GOTO T) [X] 1-2,8,14-17 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4706203  (RAMSDALE KURT A [US], et al) [X] 1-2,9,14-17 * column 5, lines 22-58; figure 1 *
by applicantGB638365
 EP0924513
 WO2006105676
 WO2007115416
 US3684953
 US4843879
 DE19535177